Gouveia v. City and County of Honolulu, et al.
Plaintiff: Kerri Kiana Gouveia
Defendant: Susan Ballard, John Doe Associations 1-10, Darren Cachola, Thomas Taflinger, Jane Does 1-10, Officer Kevin Bailey, John Does 1-10, City and County of Honolulu, Kevin Bailey, John Doe Associations 1-5 and John and/or Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00396
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kevin Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sherwood, Curtis)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/26/2019. (emt, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/26/2019. (emt, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 8/31/2020 in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 5/21/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/1/2020. Discovery due by 7/3/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:15 a.m. - 9:35 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Morita, Traci Rei)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by City and County of Honolulu. (Sherwood, Curtis)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Loo, Jonathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Morita, Traci Rei)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 9:00 AM is CONTINUED to 9:15 AM, on the same day, in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Loo, Jonathan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; CV 19-1-0649-04 JPC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #5 Additional Claims Information Sheet, #6 First Amended Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #7 Return and Acknowledgment of Service as to City and County of Honolulu, #8 Return and Acknowledgment of Service as to Kevin Bailey, #9 Notice to Parties of Removal of Action to United States District Court; Exhibit "1"; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00396 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL City and County of Honolulu from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-0649-04 JPC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2236231), filed by Honolulu, City and County of. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Morita, Traci Rei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gouveia v. City and County of Honolulu, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Cachola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Taflinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kevin Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Curtis E. Sherwood
Represented By: Traci Rei G. Morita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bailey
Represented By: Curtis E. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Associations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Kiana Gouveia
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Represented By: Gina May Szeto-Wong
Represented By: Jonathan M.F. Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?