Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC v. Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services
Plaintiff: kaumana drive partners, llc
Defendant: Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, Catherine Kortzeborn, Seema Verma and Gregory Dill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00398
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 Errata re #22 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 Scheduling Conference Statement By Plaintiff Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 (DECLARATION of Carl H. Osaki Re Proof of Service of Process Upon Respondent Department of Health & Human Services, Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC. Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl) Docket text modified on 9/4/2019 (emt, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 (DECLARATION of Carl H. Osaki Re Proof of Service of Process Upon Respondent Catherine Kortzeborn) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC. Catherine Kortzeborn served on 8/23/2019 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl) Docket text modified on 8/30/2019 (emt, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 (DECLARATION of Carl H. Osaki Re Proof of Service of Process Upon Respondent Gregory Dill) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC. Gregory Dill served on 8/23/2019 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl) Docket text modified on 8/30/2019 (emt, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 (DECLARATION of Carl H. Osaki Re Proof of Service Upon Respondent Department of Health & Human Services, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC. Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services served on 8/23/2019 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl) Docket text modified on 8/30/2019 (emt, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 EO: Pursuant to Sydney Spector's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 11/22/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 11/15/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 Letter addressed to Judge Jill A. Otake from Carl H. Osaki, Esq. and Sydney Spector, AUSA, Re: First Joint Request to Extend Briefing Schedule and Continue Hearing on Motion for Writ of Mandamus and Injunctive Relief, dated August 21, 2019. (emt, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 EO: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint letter dated 8/21/19, requesting a 60-day extension of the briefing schedule and hearing date on Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Mandamus and Injunctive Relief. Rather than continue the deadlines and hearing, the Court elects to terminate the motion without prejudice to refiling after Plaintiff completes service and Defendants have had an opportunity to respond. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Catherine Kortzeborn. (emt, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Gregory Dill. (emt, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Seema Verma. (emt, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, Alex M. Azer II. (emt, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, c/o William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States. (emt, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services, c/o Sydney Spector, AUSA. (emt, ) Modified on 8/20/2019 (emt, ).
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 proposed summons, #2 proposed summons, #3 proposed summons, #4 proposed summons, #5 proposed summons)(Osaki, Carl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 Motion for Mandamus and a Injunctive Relief:Motion Hearing is set for 10/18/2019 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition Memorandum is due 9/6/2019. Reply Memorandum is due 9/13/2019.(shm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus And Injunctive Relief Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion, #2 Declaration Of Benjamin Meeker, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Certificate of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC. (Osaki, Carl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00398 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2236455.), filed by kaumana drive partners, llc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osaki, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaumana Drive Partners, LLC v. Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health & Human Services, Centers For Medicare & Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Kortzeborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: kaumana drive partners, llc
Represented By: Carl H. Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?