Isabella Munro Properties, LLC v. Odo
Plaintiff: Isabella Munro Properties, LLC
Defendant: Brian Kiyoshi Odo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00399
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/28/2019. (emt, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 EO: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 08/24/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 07/14/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 10/30/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 05/13/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 03/25/2020. Discovery due by 06/26/2020. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:30 - 9:47.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Planning Meeting Supplemental Report of the Parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 EO: Based on the parties' responses to the Court's Order to Show Cause ("OSC") and Entering Order, the Court takes no further action on the OSC. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO #6 "ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Remanded to the State of Hawaii Circuit Court for the First Circuit" Dated July 30, 2019 and 10 Electronic Order Dated August 15, 2019; Certificate of Service by Isabella Munro Properties, LLC. (Sugimura, Yuriko) Docket text modified on 8/22/2019, linkage added to related orders (emt, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Brian Kiyoshi Odo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Brian Kiyoshi Odo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Sugimura, Yuriko)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Isabella Munro Properties, LLC. (Sugimura, Yuriko)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Isabella Munro Properties, LLC. (Sugimura, Yuriko)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting of The Parties. (Sugimura, Yuriko)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 EO: In his response to the Court's 7/30/19 Order to Show Cause, Defendant Brian Odo represents that Plaintiff's counsel stated that Plaintiff's sole member is Lance M. Dunbar. Defendant also included documentation showing that Mr. Dunbar is Plaintiff's manager. However, the fact that Mr. Dunbar is Plaintiff's manager does not establish that he is Plaintiff's member. Plaintiff is directed to verify, by 8/21/19, that Mr. Dunbar is its sole member.(JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #6 Order to Show Cause,, and in Support of Notice of Removal filed July 24, 2019 #1 filed by Brian Kiyoshi Odo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frederick W. Rohlfing III, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Brian Odo's ANSWER to Complaint filed May 29, 2019 by Brian Kiyoshi Odo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO THE STATE OF HAWAII CIRCUIT COURT FOR THE FIRST CIRCUIT - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/30/2019. Defendant must respond to this Order by August 13, 2019, by establishing the citizenship of Isabella LLC by providing all the members or owners of Isabella LLC and the citizenship of each of them. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will amount to a failure to meet Defendant's burden of establishing this Court's jurisdiction and will result in the remand of this action back to the state court. Show Cause Response due by 8/13/2019. (emt, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; CV 19-1-0845-05 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Exhibits "A"-"E"; Summons, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Declaration of Frederick W. Rohlfing III; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00399 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Brian Kiyoshi Odo. (Rohlfing, Frederick)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian Kiyoshi Odo from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-0845-05. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2236949), filed by Brian Kiyoshi Odo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isabella Munro Properties, LLC v. Odo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Munro Properties, LLC
Represented By: Yuriko J. Sugimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kiyoshi Odo
Represented By: Frederick W. Rohlfing, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?