Ito v. Perfection Collection, LLC
Plaintiff: Noella Ito
Defendant: Perfection Collection, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00403
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Pursuant to Justin Brackett's request, and by agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 10/29/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noella Ito. Perfection Collection, LLC served on 8/3/2019. (Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 8/13/2019 (jo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Perfection Collection, LLC. (cib)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00403-JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perfection Collection, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2238281.), filed by Noella Ito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ito v. Perfection Collection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfection Collection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noella Ito
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?