Trustees Of The Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds v. Akua Air Conditioning LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds
Defendant: Akua Air Conditioning LLC, Catherine A. Baitlon and Calbert H. Baitlon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00404
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 EO: Based on the entry of default, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 is vacated. No later than 10/11/2019, Plaintiffs shall file the appropriate motion for default judgment. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendants Akua Air Conditioning LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company, Catherine A. Baitlon, and Calbert H. Baitlon re ECF No. #10 . (emt, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST Request for Entry of Default by Trustees of the Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds. Catherine A. Baitlon served on 8/16/2019 . (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 8/23/2019 (emt, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds. Calbert H. Baitlon served through Catherine Akua on 8/16/2019 . (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 8/23/2019 (emt, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds. Akua Air Conditioning LLC served on 8/16/2019. (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 8/23/2019 (emt, ).
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Akua Air Conditioning LLC, Calbert H. Baitlon, Catherine A. Baitlon. (cib)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 9/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) Modified on 7/30/2019 (emt, ). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00404-HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Akua Air Conditioning LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2238942.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds v. Akua Air Conditioning LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers' Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akua Air Conditioning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Baitlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calbert H. Baitlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?