Eager v. Department of Public Safety et al

Plaintiff: Samuel Eager
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, Health Care Branch, Dr. Paderes and Dr. Saldana
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2019cv00407
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES: The Clerk for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii, gives notice of its receipt of the electronic case record for Civil Case 9:19-cv-80851-RLR; Eager vs. Department of Public Safety, transferred from the U.S. District Court for the District of Florida (West Palm Beach). Please be advised that this case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Derrick K. Watson and U.S. Magistrate Judge Wes Reber. Accordingly, please reflect Civil Case No. CV 19-00407 DKW-WRP on all further filings in this case. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Samuel Eager served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 30, 2019.
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00407 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Samuel Eager served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 30, 2019.
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:19-cv-80851. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Adopting #7 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii. The Clerk is further ordered to CLOSE THIS CASE. Motions terminated: #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Samuel Eager Recommending recommended that this case [ECF 1] be TRANSFERRED to the District of Hawaii. It is further recommended that this case be closed.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Samuel Eager; Recommending recommended that this case ECF #1 be TRANSFERRED to the District of Hawaii. It is further recommended that this case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying, without prejudice, #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. "Every pleading, written motion, and other paper must be signed by at least one attorney of record in the attorney's nameor by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. The paper must state the signer's address, e-mail address, and telephone number." Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a). Here, petitioner did not sign his motion to appoint counsel in contravention of this rule. Thus, the court denies the motion without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/28/2019. (js05) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 6/26/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006430 (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Samuel Eager. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Department of Public Safety, Dr. Paderes, Dr. Saldana, Health Care Branch. Filing fee $ 400.00, filed by Samuel Eager. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eager v. Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Paderes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Eager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?