Staunton v. Harrington et al
Plaintiff: Louis Leona Staunton, Jr.
Defendant: Trans Core of America, Department of Public Safety, State of Hawaii, Core Civic of America, Scott Harrington, Halawa Correctional Facility and Warden Thomas
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00408
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Warden Thomas, Core Civic of America, Trans Core of America, Scott Harrington, Halawa Correctional Facility - filed by Louis Leona Staunton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(a) re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/9/2019. (1) The Complaint is DISMISSED for the reasons stated above, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b)(1). (2) Staunton may file an amended pleading on or before September 9, 2019. Failure to timely file an amended pleading that cures the deficiencies discussed herein may result in dismissal of this action without further notice and result in a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (3) The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Staunton a prisoner civil rights complaint form so that he may comply with the directions of this Order if he elects to file an amended complaint. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Louis Leona Staunton, Jr. served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 12, 2019. A copy of the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form and instructions shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Staunton.
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/1/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Louis Leona Staunton, Jr. served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 1, 2019. Additionally, a copy of the order shall be served by First Class Mail to the Warden and Financial Office at Halawa Correctional Center, 99-902 Moanalua RdAiea, HI 96701. The Finance Department for the District of Hawaii, Department of Public Safety Litigation Coordinators Shelley Nobriga Harrington, Esq. and Laurie Nadamoto, Esq. served electronically via CM/ECF to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Louis Leona Staunton, Jr. (emt, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Louis Leona Staunton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staunton v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Core of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Civic of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halawa Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Leona Staunton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?