Grandinetti v. Oshiro et al
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti
Defendant: Law Office of Stanton Oshiro (Hilo) and Stanton C. Oshiro, Esq.
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00409
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 "On Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion For Relief and Legal Remedies; Post Judgment Law. Fed.R.Civ.P. Rules 52(b), 59(e), 60; and Rule 65 for TRO or 28 USC 1915(g) IACA - by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 EO: Plaintiff's Motion For Re-Appointment of Counsel [ECF 5], and any request for reconsideration regarding appointment of counsel in Plaintiff's state court proceedings, are DENIED for the reasons set forth in the Order dismissing this action [ECF 3].(CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 9, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #5 has been served to Mr. Grandinetti on 9/9/2019 by First Class Mail to the address of record. (jo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 "On Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion For Re-Appointment of Counsel - Whereof, This Honorable Court has entered an Order/Judgment on August 7, 2019. Reconsideration is respectfully sought." - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 8/7/19 pursuant to ECF No. #3 . (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER VACATING JULY 30, 2019 DEFICIENCY ORDER; DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS REQUEST AND ANY PENDING MOTIONS; AND DISMISSING THE ACTION - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/7/2019. (1) Grandinetti's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED as lacking authorization to proceed from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and as patently frivolous. (2) The court construes Grandinetti's Indigent Status Inmate Request as a request to proceed in forma pauperis and DENIES that request. (3) Grandinetti is again NOTIFIED that he may not seek habeas relief regarding his current conviction until he receives authorization to do so from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (4) The July 30, 2019 Deficiency Order is VACATED. (5) The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment and terminate this case. The court will take no further action on documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of docket entries #1 and #2 , along with a Prisoner IFP form will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record to Francis Grandinetti on July 31, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the documents electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jo)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/30/2019. (jo)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS AND CJA OF 1964 CLAIMS, COURT APPOINTED LAWYER: ONGOING NON-REPRESENTATION, INEFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL; AND WITHDRAWAL CASE against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Stanton C. Oshiro's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel in Third Circuit, State of Hawaii, #2 Medical Requests, #3 Letter to Plaintiff dated 9/14/2017 from Hawaii Paroling Authority, #4 Inmate Request Forms, #5 Mailing Envelope #6 Supplemental Documents) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandinetti v. Oshiro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Stanton Oshiro (Hilo)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton C. Oshiro, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?