Croyle et al v. Theatine Fathers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Daniel Croyle, David Croyle and Sandra G. Croyle
Defendant: Archdiocese of the Military Services USA, Theatine Fathers, Inc., The Theatine Fathers Province of our Lady of Purity, Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The and Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00421
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/1/2019. (emt, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/1/2019. (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 31 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2019. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 10/13/2020 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 6/24/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/13/2020. Discovery due by 8/14/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:30 a.m. - 9:40 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Adam G Lang appearing for Defendants Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Lang, Adam) Docket text modified on 10/1/2019 (emt, ).
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Archdiocese for the Military Services, USA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, filed August 23, 2019 [Dkt #9] Kevin W. Herring appearing for Defendant Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of The Rev. Msgr. John J.M. Foster, J.C.D., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Certificate of Compliance, #7 Certificate of Service)(Herring, Kevin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 28 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America identifying Other Affiliate Father Capodanno Guild, Other Affiliate Military Council of Catholic Women for Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Herring, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lang, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 26 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/01/2019 at 9:00 AM is CONTINUED to 9:30 AM, the same day, in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Web Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT ARCHDIOCESE OF THE MILITARY SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Herring, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Herring, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Mermelstein, Stuart)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lang, Adam)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of the Parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Herring, Kevin)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MARK E. CHOPKO re #19 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/11/2019. (emt, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice re Mark E. Chopko Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2260071.Kevin W. Herring appearing for Defendant Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America (Herring, Kevin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Herring on behalf of Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America on behalf of Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America. (Herring, Kevin)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SCOTT M. BROWNING re #15 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/4/2019. (emt, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ALEX C. MYERS re #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/4/2019. (emt, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Scott M. Browning Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2256646.Adam G Lang appearing for Defendants Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc. (Lang, Adam)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Alex C. Myers Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2256641.Adam G Lang appearing for Defendants Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc. (Lang, Adam)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna L.S. Bell on behalf of Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc. on behalf of Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc.. (Bell, Shauna)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G Lang on behalf of Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc. on behalf of Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The, Theatine Fathers, Inc.. (Lang, Adam)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 EO: In light of Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's 8/12/19 Order to Show Cause ("OSC"), the Court takes no further action on the OSC. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause; (Certificate of Service; Exhibit A & B) filed by David Croyle. (Mermelstein, Stuart) Docket text modified on 8/26/2019 (emt, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Croyle.(Mermelstein, Stuart) Modified on 8/26/2019 (emt, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STUART MERMELSTEIN re #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/21/2019. (emt, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Stuart Mermelstein Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2250046.Wayne D. Parsons appearing for Plaintiffs David Croyle, Michael Daniel Croyle, Sandra G. Croyle (Parsons, Wayne)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/12/2019. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs must file a response to this Order to Show Cause by August 26, 2019, identifying AMS's state of incorporation or providing clarification about AMS's organizational status and corresponding citizenship. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Plaintiffs have failed to carry their burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction and the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2019. (emt, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/1/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00421 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Archdiocese of the Military Services USA, The Theatine Fathers Province of our Lady of Purity, Theatine Fathers, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2243589.), filed by Sandra G. Croyle, David Croyle. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parsons, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croyle et al v. Theatine Fathers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Daniel Croyle
Represented By: Wayne D. Parsons
Represented By: Stuart Mermelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Croyle
Represented By: Wayne D. Parsons
Represented By: Stuart Mermelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra G. Croyle
Represented By: Wayne D. Parsons
Represented By: Stuart Mermelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of the Military Services USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theatine Fathers, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G Lang
Represented By: Alex C. Myers
Represented By: Scott M. Browning
Represented By: Shauna L.S. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Theatine Fathers Province of our Lady of Purity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theatine Fathers Province of Our Lady of Purity, The
Represented By: Adam G Lang
Represented By: Alex C. Myers
Represented By: Scott M. Browning
Represented By: Shauna L.S. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of the Military Services, United States of America
Represented By: Mark E. Chopko
Represented By: Kevin W. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?