Minami v. Crane Company et al
Plaintiff: Irma Minami, Individually and as Trustee of the Minami Family 2004 Revocable Living Trust Agreement and Irma Minami
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Crane Company, Flowserve US Inc., Ingersoll Rand Co., and Does 1 to 25
Not Yet Classified: Keith Hunter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00424
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Ingersoll-Rand Co.'s Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, Filed September 9, 2019 [ECF No. #16 ] ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Modified on 10/1/2019 to add linkage to Crossclaim (emt, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Co., identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Co.,.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant Ingersoll-Rand's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Crane Company, Does 1 to 25, Flowserve US Inc. by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claim Asserted by All Other Defendants Against Ingersoll-Rand Co., #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 29, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #14 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR has been served by First Class Mail to Keith Hunter, Esq. at Dispute Prevention & Resolution, Inc., 1003 Bishop Street, Pauahi Tower Suite 1155, Honolulu, HI 96813 on August 29, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/28/2019. Keith Hunter added as mediator. (emt, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter from L. Richard DeRobertis, Esq., dated August 27, 2019 Re: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for December 4, 2019) . (DeRobertis, L.) Docket text modified on 8/28/2019 (emt, ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 EP: Status Conference held on 8/26/2019. Discussion held. Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 09/09/2019 is CONTINUED to 12/4/2019 at 09:15AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement/Joint Status Report is due no later than 11/27/2019.(Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc... (Reinke, Stefan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan M. Reinke on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. on behalf of Flowserve US Inc.. (Reinke, Stefan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver Brooks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc. for Cleaver Brooks, Inc... (Reinke, Stefan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan M. Reinke on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Reinke, Stefan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed July 11, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Does 1 to 25, Flowserve US Inc., Ingersoll Rand Co., by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, CV 19-1-1089-07 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Summons, #5 Request to Exempt Case from the Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Summary of Facts, #6 Arbitration Administrator's Decision Granting Request to Exempt a Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program, #7 Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Notice of Appearance; Certificate of Service, #8 Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service, #9 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #10 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #12 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #13 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit A (Part 6 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit A (Part 7 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit A (Part 8 of 9 to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #17 Exhibit A (Part 9 of 9) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #18 Certificate of Service to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ). Modified on 8/9/2019 (emt, ).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00424 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit, Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #2 Exhibit 4b - Forman,Samuel.Affidavit. Ex. A-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #3 Exhibit 5 - Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harstad, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3b - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. G, H, J, L, #2 Exhibit 3c - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. N, O, P, #3 Exhibit 3d - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. R, T, U)(Harstad, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-1089-07 JHA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2243763), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Irma Minami Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D, #4 Exhibit 3a - Sargent,David.Affidavit, Ex. A, A-1, B, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minami v. Crane Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Stefan M. Reinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Stefan M. Reinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.,
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Minami, Individually and as Trustee of the Minami Family 2004 Revocable Living Trust Agreement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Minami
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?