Dixon et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Lawrence D Dixon and Anne C Dixon
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00426
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS via email to the Northern District of California re #7 Conditional Transfer Order. (cib)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-150) Finalized on 9/11/19. Please see pleading (3 in ALN/2:19-cv-00975, 3 in ALN/2:19-cv-01020, 3 in ALN/2:19-cv-01281, 3 in CAE/1:19-cv-01095, 3 in CAE/2:19-cv-01562, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00600, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00612, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00614, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00615, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00618, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00622, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00623, 3 in FLS/0:19-cv-61980, 3 in HI/1:19-cv-00426, 3 in LAE/2:19-cv-12309, 1229 in MDL No. 2741, 3 in MIE/2:19-cv-12410, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02176, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02355, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02362, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02364, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02342, 3 in MSN/4:19-cv-00098).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/11/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, ALN/2:19-cv-00975, ALN/2:19-cv-01020, ALN/2:19-cv-01281, CAE/1:19-cv-01095, CAE/2:19-cv-01562, FLM/2:19-cv-00600, FLM/2:19-cv-00612, FLM/2:19-cv-00614, FLM/2:19-cv-00615, FLM/2:19-cv-00618, FLM/2:19-cv-00622, FLM/2:19-cv-00623, FLS/0:19-cv-61980, HI/1:19-cv-00426, LAE/2:19-cv-12309, MIE/2:19-cv-12410, MN/0:19-cv-02176, MN/0:19-cv-02355, MN/0:19-cv-02362, MN/0:19-cv-02364, MOE/4:19-cv-02342, MSN/4:19-cv-00098 (CMD). (cib)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER dated 9/11/2019 transferring this case to the USDC for the Northern District of California pursuant to MDL Docket No. 2741. Signed and sealed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel.(cib)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Monsanto Company served on 8/12/2019 filed by Anne C Dixon, Lawrence D Dixon. (Green, Michael) Modified docket text on 8/13/2019 to add service date(cib).
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company (jo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 10/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00426 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2245435.), filed by Anne C Dixon, Lawrence D Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Proposed Summons)(Green, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence D Dixon
Represented By: Maria F. Penn
Represented By: Denise M. Hevicon
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne C Dixon
Represented By: Maria F. Penn
Represented By: Denise M. Hevicon
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?