Kang v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Tina Kang
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00428
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velocity Investments, LLC. (Roeca, Jodie)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Velocity Investments, LLC.(Roeca, Jodie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Kang. Velocity Investments, LLC. (Brackett, Justin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Court finds good cause to grant Plaintiff's request to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to allow Plaintiff to complete service. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/07/2019 is CONTINUED to 11/04/2019 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Velocity Investments, LLC. (cib)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Velocity Investments, LLC (jo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00428 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Velocity Investments, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2245972.), filed by Tina Kang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kang v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jodie D. Roeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Kang
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?