Iyonsi v. FDA
Plaintiff: Orighoye Dennis Iyonsi
Defendant: FDA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00431
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 EO: In light of the #5 Order, allowing Plaintiff time to file an amended complaint by October 28, 2019, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/07/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 11/08/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statement are due by 11/01/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (2) HOLDING IFP APPLICATION IN ABEYANCE PENDING THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT re: #1 , #2 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/23/2019. Based on the foregoing: (1) Plaintiff failed to establish standing to sue and therefore, his Complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3) for lack of jurisdiction; (2) Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim; (3) Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint, as permitted by this Order, on or before October 28, 2019; and (4) Plaintiff's IFP Application is held in abeyance pending the filing of an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint by October 28, 2019 will result in automatic dismissal of this action without prejudice. To assist Plaintiff, a copy of Iyonsi I's September 23 Order is attached to this Order. (Attachments: #1 Iyonsi I's September 23 Order) (jo)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Scheduling Conference Statement by Orighoye Dennis Iyonsi (jo)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 10/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service- Plaintiff received a copy of the attached documents during intake process
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Orighoye Dennis Iyonsi (jo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ("BRIEF FOR THE UNITED STATES AS AMICUS CURIAE") against FDA - filed by Orighoye Dennis Iyonsi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iyonsi v. FDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orighoye Dennis Iyonsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?