Sciotto et al v. Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The
Plaintiff: Dennis R. Sciotto, Carol Ann Sciotto, Karen Jeanne Colson and Edward E. Colson
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00433
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 10/7/2019 to 12/30/2019 at 9:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
September 23, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #11 Errata was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that the Table of Contents should have been submitted with an appropriate caption cover page, identifying the case number and the person filing the document, see LR10.2(b) and LR10.2(c). No further action necessary. (emt, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on #10 Defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction set for 12/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Errata re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Table of Contents and Table to Authorities in Support of Defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resorts Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Dkt. 10). (Odani, Norman)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Norman K. Odani appearing for Defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of William C. Byrns, #3 Declaration of Geoffrey B. King, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Certificate of Service)(Odani, Norman)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis R. Sciotto, Karen Jeanne Colson, Edward E. Colson, Carol Ann Sciotto. Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The served on 8/29/2019 . (Kobashigawa, Clarisse) Modified on 9/6/2019 (emt, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The. (emt, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Kobashigawa, Clarisse)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The. (emt, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Kobashigawa, Clarisse)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00433 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, and Damages; Jury Demand against Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2246132.), filed by Dennis R Sciotto, Karen Jeanne Colson, Edward E Colson, Carol Ann Sciotto.(Kobashigawa, Clarisse) Docket text modified on 8/12/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sciotto et al v. Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis R. Sciotto
Represented By: Clarisse M. Kobashigawa
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ann Sciotto
Represented By: Clarisse M. Kobashigawa
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jeanne Colson
Represented By: Clarisse M. Kobashigawa
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E. Colson
Represented By: Clarisse M. Kobashigawa
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Hanalei Bay Resort, The
Represented By: Norman K. Odani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?