AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, et al v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Plaintiff: AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund and Hotel Union and Hotel Industry of Hawaii Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Modern Management Services, LLC, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Waikiki Development, LLC and Resort Management International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00439
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Waikiki Development, LLC, Resort Management International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dakota Parent, Inc. for Diamond Resorts International, Inc.; Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Management & Exchange Holding Company for Resort Management International, Inc.; Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Waikiki Development, LLC.. (Rand, Richard)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint [DEFENDANTS DIAMOND RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, INC., DIAMOND RESORTS WAIKIKI DEVELOPMENT, LLC, AND RESORT MANAGEMENT INTERNATIONAL, INC., dba THE MODERN HONOLULUS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE, ASSUMPSIT AND DAMAGES, FILED SEPTEMBER 4, 2019 [ECF NO. #7 ] by Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Waikiki Development, LLC, Resort Management International, Inc.. (Rand, Richard) Modified docket text and linkage on 10/2/2019 (ens).
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 10/8/2019 to 11/19/2019 at 9:45AM in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Amended Complaint,, Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of First Amended Complaint fro Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages Acknowledgement filed by AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Ikeda, Ashley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Waikiki Development, LLC, Resort Management International, Inc. (emt, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Modern Management Services, LLC, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Diamond Resorts Waikiki Development, LLC and Resort Management International, Inc., dba The Modern Honolulu filed by AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley) Docket text modified on 9/5/2019 (emt, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Modern Management Services, LLC. (cib)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/8/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00439-JAO-WRP on all further pleadings.(cib)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Ikeda, Ashley)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Modern Management Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2246939.), filed by AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, et al v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Waikiki Development, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resort Management International, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFL Hotel and Restaurant Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotel Union and Hotel Industry of Hawaii Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?