Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC v. Nimiety Group LLC
Plaintiff: Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC
Defendant: Nimiety Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00441
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint; Summons; Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Proof of Service) served on Nimiety Group LLC, Attn: Ruth Silvia on September 18, 2019 and October 7, 2019, filed by Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Brittin, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Pursuant to Michael Marsh's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 11/27/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 11/20/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/19 @ 9:00 AM to 10/29/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nimiety Group LLC (jo)
August 15, 2019 AMENDED COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark has been served by First Class Mail to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450. (jo)
August 15, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 on August 15, 2019. (jo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC re #1 Complaint Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC. (Marsh, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00441 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC. (Marsh, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC. (Marsh, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nimiety Group LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2247943.), filed by Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Marsh, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC v. Nimiety Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nimiety Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ko Olina Intangibles, LLC
Represented By: David Geoffrey Brittin
Represented By: Michael R. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?