Komata v. Crane Company et al
Plaintiff: Clarence WB Mau, Cariann Komata and Clarence W. B. Mau
Defendant: Crane Company, Does 1-25 and Ingersoll Rand Co.,
Not Yet Classified: Keith Hunter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00445
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Simon, Derek)
September 24, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #22 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR has been served by First Class Mail to Keith Hunter, Dispute Prevention & Resolution, Inc., 1003 Bishop Street, Suite 1155, Honolulu, HI 96813 on September 24, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/24/2019. Keith Hunter added as Mediator. (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clarence W. B. Mau Cariann Komata, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Clarence W. B. Mau, Deceased . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aoki, Allison) Docket text modified on 9/25/2019 (emt, ).
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing not held. The parties confirm that they have agreed to participating in a formal mediation.Status Conference is set for March 25, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:27 - 9:30.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 EO: For good cause shown, and given the lack of any opposition, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint by September 27, 2019.By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on September 23, 2019. (bbb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 STATEMENT of No Position re #12 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Defendant Crane Co.'s Statement of No Position Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, Filed September 10, 2019 [ECF No. 12] filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Ingersoll-Rand's Crossclaim Against Other Defendans, Filed August 30, 2019 [ECF No. 9] ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Ingersoll-Rand's Crossclaim Against Other Defendants, Filed August 30, 2019 [ECF No. 9])(Simon, Derek)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND CO.'S RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeRobertis, L.) Modified on 9/17/2019 The Scheduling Conference Statement is electronically signed by "/s/ Alyssa R. Segawa" and the Certificate of Service is electronically signed "/s/ L. Richard DeRobertis". The document was e-filed under the CM/ECF login credentials of L. Richard DeRobertis (emt, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 EO: On September 10, 2019, Plaintiff filed a #12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The Court finds this matter suitable for disposition without a hearing pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c). Defendants shall file an opposition by 09/20/2019. Plaintiff may file a reply by 09/27/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield2)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Allison M. Fujita appearing for Plaintiff Clarence W. B. Mau (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Fujita, Allison)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Goodwin, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Co., identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Co.,.. (Goodwin, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Ingersoll-Rand's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Company by Ingersoll Rand Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claim Asserted by All Other Defendants Against Ingersoll-Rand Co., #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield from L. Richard DeRobertis, Esq., dated August 27, 2019 Re: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for September 23, 2019.) . (DeRobertis, L.) Docket text modified on 8/28/2019 (emt, ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed July 25, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM Against All Other Defendants against Does 1-25, Ingersoll Rand Co., by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Modified on 8/27/2019 (emt, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII, CV 19-1-1176-07 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Summons, #5 Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Summary of Facts, #6 Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination; Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Arbitration Administrator's Decision Granting Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program, #9 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service, #10 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 8 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #13 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 8 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit A (Part 6 of 8 ) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit A (Part 7 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #17 Exhibit A (Part 8 of 8) to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #18 Certificate of Service to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (emt, ). Modified on 8/23/2019 (emt, ).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 9/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00445 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit, Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #2 Exhibit 4b - Forman,Samuel.Affidavit. Ex. A-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #3 Exhibit 5 - Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harstad, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3b - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. G, H, J, L, #2 Exhibit 3c - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. N, O, P, #3 Exhibit 3d - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. R, T, U)(Harstad, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1442 & 1446 from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-1176-07 JHA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2249322), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Clarence W.B. Mau Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D, #4 Exhibit 3a - Sargent,David.Affidavit, Ex. A, A-1, B, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Komata v. Crane Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.,
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence WB Mau
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cariann Komata
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence W. B. Mau
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?