Marroquin v. City and County of Honolulu et al
Plaintiff: Ges E. Marroquin
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, City and County of Honolulu, Doe Corporations 1-10, Ace Towing Service Inc. and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00446
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyoshi, Philip)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu Defendant City and County of Honolulu's Initial Disclosures (Morita, Traci Rei)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Morita, Traci Rei)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ges E. Marroquin. City and County of Honolulu waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Miyoshi, Philip)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ges E. Marroquin. Ace Towing Service Inc. waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Miyoshi, Philip)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ace Towing Service Inc. (jo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu (jo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00446 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Miyoshi, Philip)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miyoshi, Philip)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2249354.), filed by Ges E. Marroquin. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miyoshi, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marroquin v. City and County of Honolulu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Traci Rei G. Morita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Towing Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ges E. Marroquin
Represented By: Philip W. Miyoshi
Represented By: Randall K. Hironaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?