Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, et al. v. D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hawaii Iron Workers Stabilization Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Training Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Pension Trust Fund and Hawaii Iron Workers Annuity Trust Fund
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10, D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc., Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Government Agencies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00447
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Conference of the Parties by Hawaii Iron Workers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Pension Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Stabilization Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Training Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund. (Tilker, Brian)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT D&C WELDING STRUCTURAL & ORNAMENTAL, INC - filed by Hawaii Iron Workers Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian W. Tilker, #2 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service) #3 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc. (jo)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawaii Iron Workers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Pension Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Stabilization Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Training Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund. D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc. served on 9/7/2019. (Tilker, Brian) Docket Text Modified on 10/1/2019 (jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawaii Iron Workers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Pension Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Stabilization Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Training Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund. D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc. served on 9/7/2019 . (Tilker, Brian) Modified on 9/13/2019 (emt, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaii Iron Workers Annuity Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Hawaii Iron Workers Pension Trust Fund. (Tilker, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/19 @ 9:00 AM to 10/30/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/23/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc.. (cib)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00447-HG-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2249397.), filed by Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, by its trustees, Clyde Eugenio, Shon T.G.P. Moea'i, Lincoln Naiwi, Sr., Joseph O'Donnell, Melvin Kahele, Bronson Paris, Thomas G. Paris, Ed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons in a Civil Action)(Tilker, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, et al. v. D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Iron Workers Stabilization Fund
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Represented By: J. George Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Iron Workers Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Represented By: J. George Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Iron Workers Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Represented By: J. George Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Iron Workers Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Represented By: J. George Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Iron Workers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Represented By: J. George Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Iron Workers Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Represented By: J. George Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&C Welding Structural & Ornamental, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Government Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?