Bodyguard Productions, Inc. v. Pacific DirectConnect, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Pacific DirectConnect, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00456
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/26/2019. (jo)
September 20, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Hand Delivered to: U.S. Copyright Office. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (apg, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 EO: The Court GRANTS the parties' request in the Joint Report of Meeting to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to allow additional time for the parties to explore settlement and for Defendant to respond to the Complaint. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 11/19/2019 to 12/9/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. All Defendants. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 is CONTINUED to 11/19/2019 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Defendant Pacific DirectConnect, Inc. (jo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 23, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 Report On The Filing Or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright and #1 Complaint has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 on August 23, 2019. (jo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00456 ACK-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bodyguard Productions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Bodyguard Productions, Inc. Copyright Report Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT and (2) DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against Pacific DirectConnect, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2252212.), filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of DANIEL ARHEIDT, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodyguard Productions, Inc. v. Pacific DirectConnect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific DirectConnect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?