Kim; et al. v. Queens Medical Center; et al.
Plaintiff: Beatrice Kim and Raymond Kim
Defendant: CMS, Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10, Queen's Medical Center, Doe Government Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Leon Liem, Jennifer Moran, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00463
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Raymond Kim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sumida, Kevin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; COS filed by CMS. (Butler, Jeremy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 EO: In light of the pending Motion to Remand, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 9/30/2019 to 9:15AM on 12/31/2019 in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court set for 10:00 a.m. on 11/8/2019 in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court directs briefing as follows: opposition shall be filed no later than 9/30/2019; reply shall be filed no later than 10/21/2019. (agh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS From Circuit Court First Circuit; CV 15-1-1990; (Part 2 of 2, Vol. 2) (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: HAJIS, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Trial, #4 Notice of Taking Deposition, #5 Subpoena Duces Tecum, #6 Order Resetting Trial Week, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Certificate of Service, #11 Defendant LIEM, M.D.'s Motion For Protective Order, #12 Supplemental COS, #13 Defendant QMC Statement of No Opposition, #14 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to File Their Memorandum in Opposition Under Seal (Received), #15 Defendant LIEM, M.D.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion, #16 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to File Their Memorandum In Opposition Under Seal, #17 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #18 Plaintiffs' Ex Pare Motion to Shorten Time, #19 Reply Memordandum in Support of Defendant LIEM, M.D.'s Motion For Protective Order, #20 Supplemental COS, #21 Defendant LIEM, M.D.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #22 Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #23 Order Granting In Part Defendant LIEM, M.D.'s Motion For Protective Order, #24 Certificate of Service, #25 Stipulated Order Re: Damages, #26 Certificate of Service, #27 Plaintiffs' Motion to Find CMS/Medicare Lien Non-Recoverable, #28 Defendant QMC's Joinder re Plaintiffs' Motion to find CMS/Medicare Lien Non-Recoverable, #29 Amended Notice of Hearing, #30 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #31 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Find CMS/Medicare Lien Non-Recoverable) (jo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS From Circuit Court First Circuit; CV 15-1-1990-10 (Part 1 of 2, Vol. 1) (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: HAJIS, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 Request to Remove Case from CAPP, #6 Defendant Leon Liem, M.D.'s Answer to Complaint, #7 Return and Acknowledgment of Service re: Leon Liem, M.D., #8 Return and Acknowledgment of Service re Queen's Medical Center, #9 Return and Acknowledgment of Service re Jennifer Moran, #10 Defendants QMC and Jennifer Moran's Answer to Complaint, #11 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request to Remove Case from CAAP, #12 Request to Exempt Case from CAAP by Defendant LIEM, M.D., #13 Notice of Taking Deposition, #14 Subpoena Duces Tecum re Aloha Urology, #15 Subpoena Duces Tecum re QMC, #16 Certificate of Service, #17 Certificate of Service, #18 Certificate of Service, #19 Certificate of Service, #20 Certificate of Service, #21 Certificate of Service, #22 Plaintiffs' Pretrial Statement, #23 Defendant Leon Liem, M.D.'s Responsive Pretrial Statement, #24 Defendant QMC and Jennifer Moran, APRN's Responsive Pretrial Statement, #25 Notice of Trial Setting Conference, #26 SDT re Central Medical Clinic / Michael Nagoshi, MD, #27 Notice of Taking Deposition, #28 Trial Setting Status Conference Order of 11/7/2016, #29 Notice of Taking Deposition, #30 Subpoena Duces Tecum re Kuakini Medical Center, #31 Notice of Taking Deposition, #32 Subpoena Duces Tecum re Honolulu Police Department, #33 Notice of Change of Firm Name re Counsel for Defendant LIEM, M.D., #34 Subpoena Duces Tecum re Kaiser Permanente Patient Accounting, #35 Subpoena Duces Tecum re Kaiser Permanente, #36 Subpoena Duces Tecum re Kaiser Permanente, #37 Notice of Taking Deposition, #38 Subpoena Duces Tecum re HMSA, #39 Certificate of Service, #40 Certificate of Service, #41 Plaintiffs' Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition, #42 Certificate of Service, #43 Notice of Taking Deposition, #44 Subpoena Duces Tecum re: Castle Medical Center, #45 Defendant Leon Liem, M.D.'s First Amended Responsive Pretrial Statement, #46 Certificate of Service, #47 Defendant Leon Liem, M.D.'s Second Amended Responsive Pretrial Statement, #48 Plaintiffs' Rule 68 Offer of Settlement, #49 Defendant Leon Liem, M.D.'s Final Naming of Witnesses, #50 Defendants QMC and Jennifer Moran, APRN's Final Naming of Witnesses, #51 Plaintiffs' Final Naming of Witnesses, #52 Notice of Settlement Conference, #53 Stipulation for Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice re Defendant Jennifer Moran, APRN, #54 Certificate of Service, #55 Joint Motion to Continue Trial) (jo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS From Circuit Court of the First Circuit; CV 15-1-1990-10 (SEALED Attachment: #1 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition To Defendant Leon Liem, M.D.'s Motion For A Protective Order) (jo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Kevin P.H. Sumida appearing for Plaintiffs Beatrice Kim, Raymond Kim (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Kevin P.H. Sumida, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Certificate of Service)(Sumida, Kevin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 WRIT of Certiorari To The Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii - Issued. (jo)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF CERTIORARI re: #4 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/3/2019. (jo)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Writ of of Certiorari Ordering the Circuit Court Records from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii by CMS. (Butler, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00463 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CMS ; COS, filed by CMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Motion to Find CMS/Medicare Lien Non-Recoverable, Civil 15-1-1990-10 JCM , #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Butler, Jeremy) Docket text modified on 8/29/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim; et al. v. Queens Medical Center; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Kim
Represented By: Stephen K Roy
Represented By: Kevin P.H. Sumida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Kim
Represented By: Stephen K Roy
Represented By: Kevin P.H. Sumida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS
Represented By: Jeremy J. Butler
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen's Medical Center
Represented By: Thomas E. Cook
Represented By: Edquon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Government Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Liem
Represented By: April Luria
Represented By: Arthur F. Roeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?