Mosquera v. Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation
Plaintiff: Ricardo Daniel Mosquera
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00466
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 19-00466 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 EO: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff Ricardo Daniel Mosquera's motion to reassign case to Judge Leslie Kobayashi, Dkt. No. 11, and a response in opposition from Defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation, Dkt. No. 15. Having reviewed the foregoing and the other records in the relevant actions, the Court finds that judicial efficiencies will be obtained from a reassignment of this case to Judge Kobayashi. Therefore, the motion to reassign case is GRANTED and, pursuant to Local Rule 40.2, the Clerk is instructed to reassign this case to Judge Kobayashi. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Reassign Case to Honorable Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi filed by Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation. (Luke, Michele-Lynn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 [AMENDED DOCUMENT] Amended Declaration Timothy E. Ho in Support of #11 Plaintiff Ricardo Daniel Mosquera's MOTION to Reassign Case to Honorable Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi, Filed October 8, 2019 by Ricardo Daniel Mosquera. . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ho, Timothy) Docket text modified on 10/15/2019 (emt, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 EO: On October 8, 2019, Plaintiff Ricardo Daniel Mosquera filed a motion to reassign case pursuant to Local Rule 40.2, Dkt. No. 11. Because Plaintiff filed a motion, rather than a notice of related case as Local Rule 40.2 envisions, and also ignored Local Rule 7.8's requirement to confer with opposing counsel before filing a motion, the Court allows Defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation until October 16, 2019 to file a response to the instant motion. Should Defendant concur in, or at least not oppose, the requested relief, the Court intends to have this case reassigned to Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi, as the motion requests. Finally, because it appears that counsel for Plaintiff is unaware that the Local Rules have recently changed, having quoted in his motion a provision in the Local Rules that no longer exists, the Court suggests that counsel review the Local Rules that came into effect on September 1, 2019. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on October 9, 2019. (bbb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Reassign Case to Honorable Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi Timothy E. Ho appearing for Plaintiff Ricardo Daniel Mosquera (Attachments: #1 Declaration Timothy E. Ho, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Ho, Timothy)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on September 30, 2019. (bbb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 11/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/06/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 12/09/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 08/05/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 06/17/2020. Discovery due by 09/18/2020. At the Early Settlement conference, telephonic appearances will be allowed. Any participant(s) via telephone shall be relayed to all counsel and Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298, prior to conference date. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:29 - 9:33.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff Ricardo Daniel Mosquera's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ho, Timothy) Docket text modified on 10/1/2019 (emt, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation. (Chun, Bradford)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Chun, Bradford)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 19-1-1187-07, 11TH DIV. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (AOAO Makaha Valley Plantation), #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit A; Notice to Clerk of First Circuit Court, Certificate of Service) (emt, )
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 9/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00466 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ricardo Daniel Mosquera, filed by Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons - CV 19-1-1187-07) , #3 Certificate of Service)(Luke, Michele-Lynn) Docket Text Modified on 8/29/2019 (jo) Modified on 8/30/2019 (emt, ).
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation from circuit court of the first circuit, case number 19-1-1187-07. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2255184), filed by Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation.(Luke, Michele-Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosquera v. Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Makaha Valley Plantation
Represented By: Bradford Chun
Represented By: Saori Paige Takahashi
Represented By: Michele-Lynn E. Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Daniel Mosquera
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?