Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company v. Maui Moto Adventures LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Defendant: Maui Moto Adventures LLC and Jordan Patterson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00467
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 12/3/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 11/26/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Mid-Continent Casualty Company for Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sia, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Maui Moto Adventures LLC, Jordan Patterson. (cib)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 10/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00467-LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2255265.), filed by Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Main Document Summons)(Sia, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company v. Maui Moto Adventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maui Moto Adventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey H.K. Sia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?