Malori v. Leong et al
Plaintiff: Roberta Malori
Defendant: Gene Leong, Randy M. Leong and Shery T. Kajiwara
Case Number: 1:2019cv00473
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 is CONTINUED to 12/18/2019 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ORIGINAL SIGNATURE of Plaintiff Roberta Malori submitted for #1 Complaint and Request for Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, )
September 13, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Pursuant to ECF No. 5 Minute Order, the documents received by the Clerk's Office on September 3, 2019, which include documents titled, "Complaint and Request for Injunction", "Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs", and "Civil Cover Sheet" were returned to Plaintiff Roberta Malori by First Class Mail to the address of record on September 13, 2019. (emt, )
September 13, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Docket No. 5 has been served by First Class Mail to Roberta Malori at the address of record on September 13, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 EO: On September 3, 2019, at 8:30 AM, pro se Plaintiff Roberta Malori filed her complaint (Dkt. No. 1) as well as an application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Dkt. No. 3). Because the complaint was not signed, the Clerk of Court later notified Malori and directed her to sign the enclosed complaint and return it to the Clerk's Office. That same day, at approximately 3:55 PM, an individual purporting to be "a friend" of Malori's delivered three documents to the Clerk's Office: (1) a complaint; (2) an IFP application; and (3) a civil cover sheet. The documents are substantially the same as the original documents filed by Malori herself, with the exception that the complaint is shorter by three pages and the IFP application does not contain the same detailed answers to the questions (only the word "no" in large lettering across the page). But most importantly, the complaint is not signed. These documents will not be filed in the instant action. Pursuant to Local Rules 10.2(b) and 81.1(a), what separates a licensed attorney from a pro se litigant is the ability to file documents for, and appear on behalf of, another individual. See LR 10.2(b); 81.1(1); 83.2. Nothing suggests Malori's "friend" is a licensed attorney. As such, the Court cannot say whether Malori wished to have these documents filed on her behalf, thereby superseding Dkt. Nos. 1-3, nor can the Court divine the purpose of these documents. If Malori wishes, she may file the documents herself in accordance with Local Rules 10.2 and 81.1(c) or have a licensed attorney do so, and explain what these documents are intended to accomplish. For now, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to return the tendered materials to Malori, as the Court has no contact information on Malori's "friend." (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint and Advisory Entry have been served by First Class Mail to Roberta Malori at the address of record on September 3, 2019. A "business reply" envelope has been included in the mailing to Plaintiff. (emt, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - A copy of the Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Corporate Disclosure Memo have been served by First Class Mail to Roberta Malori at the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 3, 2019.
September 3, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Roberta Malori is not signed. The Plaintiff is directed to sign the enclosed copy of the Complaint and return it to the Clerk's Office as soon as possible. (emt, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Roberta Malori. (emt, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Roberta Malori. (emt, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against All Defendants - filed by Roberta Malori. Note: The Complaint is not signed. (emt, ) Modified on 9/3/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malori v. Leong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Malori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy M. Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shery T. Kajiwara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?