Armstrong vs. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Murray Armstrong and Susan M. Armstrong
Defendant: Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Jimmy Rogers, General Motors LLC, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, EAN Holdings, LLC, Crawford Group, Inc., The, Joshua B. Greenwood, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Non-Profit Entities 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00480
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to #28 Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Civil Action (Case No. 1:19-CV-00480 LEK-RT) to State Court, Filed on October 25, 2019 [DOC #28] filed by Susan M. Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jon S. Jacobs, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Certificate of Service)(Jacobs, Jon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 Joinder re #28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by EAN Holdings, LLC Defendant General Motors LLC's Joinder to Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. 21) filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(St. Sure, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court (DEFENDANT EAN HOLDINGS, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS SUSAN MURRAY ARMSTRONG'S MOTION TO REMAND CIVIL ACTION (CASE NO. 1:19-CV-00480 LEK-RT) TO STATE COURT, FILED ON OCTOBER 4, 2019 [DOC #21]) filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kenneth Fukunaga, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company for General Motors LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Young, Calvin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Young, Calvin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 EO: COURT ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(rls, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - not held. Discussion had re: status of the case, and the pending motions to dismiss and motion to remand set for 11/15/19 before Judge Kobayashi.The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued to 1/7/20 @ 9:00 a.m.Counsel do not need to submit anything. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/7/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing date has been set for 11/15/2019 at 9:45 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (tl, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 24 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII, CV 19-1-1372-08 BIA (Re: Notice of Filing Amended Notice of Removal; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service). (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #5 Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Statement of Facts, #6 Arbitration Administrator's Decision Granting Request to Exempt Case from Court Annexed Program, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit "1"; Certificate of Service, #8 Transmittal to Clerk's Office, dated September 6, 2019, #9 Return and Acknowlegment of Service (Jimmy Rogers), #10 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (General Motors LLC), #11 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc.), #12 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (EAN Holdings LLC), #13 Notice of Filing Amended Notice of Removal; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court Jon S. Jacobs appearing for Plaintiff Susan M. Armstrong (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Jon S. Jacobs, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Jacobs, Jon)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 EO: Bettina J. Strauss and Timothy J. Hasken are allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/19 @ 9:00 AM. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 Scheduling Conference Statement [DEFENDANT EAN HOLDINGS, LLC dba ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS' RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 [AMENDED DOCUMENT] [ AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL ; EXHIBIT A; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE]. by EAN Holdings, LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth) Modified on 10/1/2019 (emt, ).
September 28, 2019 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Jacobs, Jon)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Planning Meeting [JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT OF THE PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT re #5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Crawford Group, Inc., The, EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO TIMOTHY J. HASKEN re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/18/2019. (emt, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BETTINA J. STRAUSS re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/18/2019. (emt, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice TIMOTHY J. HASKEN Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2263550.Kenneth K. Fukunaga appearing for Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Counsel, #2 Order Granting Motion to Appeal Pro Hac Vice)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Bettina J. Strauss Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2263530.Kenneth K. Fukunaga appearing for Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Counsel, #2 Order Granting Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant The Crawford Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Fleet Management's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing date has been set for 11/15/2019 at 9:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (tl, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 [Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service] ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Defendant Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Fleet Management's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction] Kenneth K. Fukunaga appearing for Defendant Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Steve F. Usselmann, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Defendant The Crawford Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction] Kenneth K. Fukunaga appearing for Defendant Crawford Group, Inc., The (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Rick A. Short, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS From Circuit Court of the First Circuit State of Hawaii, Their case number: CV 19-1-1372-08-BIA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Hawaii Judicial Information System(HAJIS), #2 Civil Information Sheet, #3 State Court Documents) (cib)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/7/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00480 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAN Holdings, LLC dba Enterprise Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by General Motors LLC. (Fukunaga, Kenneth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Motors LLC EAN Holdings, LLC [NOTICE OF REMOVAL; EXHIBIT A; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number Civil No. 19-1-1372-08. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2257201), filed by General Motors LLC EAN Holdings, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth) Modified on 9/4/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong vs. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth K. Fukunaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. St. Sure
Represented By: Calvin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Petersen Ching
Represented By: Kenneth K. Fukunaga
Represented By: Timothy J. Hasken
Represented By: Bettina J. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford Group, Inc., The
Represented By: Kenneth K. Fukunaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua B. Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Armstrong
Represented By: Jon S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Armstrong
Represented By: Jon S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?