Armijo v. Costco Wholesale Warehouse, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Justin William Armijo
Defendant: John Does 1-200, Liane Shimoku Lopez, Carl Carrillo, Robin, Elaine, Tim Wiley, Paul Karnuth, Costco Wholesale Warehouse, Inc., Ann Kamura, Hoku, Ester Tugurian, Lynn, Garret Tong, Randal Lockwood and Kim
Case Number: 1:2019cv00484
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 EO: On 9/6/19, Plaintiff Armijo filed his Complaint for Employment Discrimination (ECF No. 1) ("Complaint") and an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (ECF No. 2) ("Application"). In reviewing the Application, the Court must perform a mandatory screening of each action. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). However, the Court is unable to read large portions of the last 8 pages of the Complaint. The last 8 pages of the Complaint (ECF No. 1-2, pp. 11-18) contain numbered, handwritten paragraphs that appear to be a continuation of the previous page (ECF No. 1-2, p. 10). Also, it appears that the typed portion of Plaintiff's Complaint ends at a paragraph numbered 7 (ECF No. 1-2, p. 10), but the handwritten portion on page 8 begins with a paragraph numbered 16 (ECF No. 1-2, pp. 11). The Court cannot accurately screen the Application and Complaint because the last 8 pages of the Complaint are largely illegible. Under LR10.2, all documents submitted to the Court shall be "clearly legible." Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to submit an amended complaint by November 15, 2019. The Court requires that the amended complaint be in the form required by LR10.2. The Court will rule on Plaintiff's Application after the amended complaint is filed. If Plaintiff fails to submit an amended complaint by November 15, 2019, the Court will issue a decision based on the Application (ECF No. 2) and original Complaint (ECF No. 1). The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/19 @ 9:00 a.m. is continued to 12/17/19 @ 9:00 a.m. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/10/19. re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/17/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 EO: Plaintiff Justin William Armijo is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/19 @ 9:00 AM. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Errata by Justin William Armijo (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants were served by First Class Mail on September 16, 2019 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 11/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Justin William Armijo (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Employment Discrimination against All Defendants - filed by Justin William Armijo. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Documents, #2 Supplemental Documents, #3 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armijo v. Costco Wholesale Warehouse, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liane Shimoku Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Karnuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Warehouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Kamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ester Tugurian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garret Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin William Armijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?