Spurling et al v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dominique Spurling, Florence Miguel, Donavan Chang and Donovan Chang
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-50 and Diamond Resorts International
Case Number: 1:2019cv00492
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re ECF No. #8 STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION BACK TO FIRST CIRCUIT COURT, STATE OF HAWAII AND ORDER. (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Transmittal Letter to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re ECF No. #8 STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION BACK TO FIRST CIRCUIT COURT, STATE OF HAWAII AND ORDER, dated September 27, 2019. (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION BACK TO FIRST CIRCUIT COURT, STATE OF HAWAII AND ORDER - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/27/2019. Pursuant to the above Stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, the case and all files herein are REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii for further proceedings. (emt, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Resorts International identifying Corporate Parent Dakota Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Dakota Intermediate, Inc., Corporate Parent Dakota Parent, Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC for Diamond Resorts International.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sato, Gregory)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Diamond Resorts International. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sato, Gregory)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 19-1-1158-07 JPC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #5 Proof of Service; Exhibit "A", #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit "1"; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diamond Resorts International re #1 Notice of Removal, AMENDED (Monlux, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the 2 Notice of Case Assignment, Notice to Non E-Filer, and #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Corporate Disclosure Memo has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on September 11, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) Modified on 9/11/2019 (emt, ).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/16/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 11, 2019 Notice to Non E-Filer - The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda via both paper and electronic service. Beginning with the email service of document number 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment, the Clerk's Office will only serve Kobayashi Sugita & Goda electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. (emt, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00492 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Resorts International, Inc. from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number Civ. No. 19-1-1158-07 JPC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2260203), filed by Diamond Resorts International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory M. Sato, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sato, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurling et al v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts International
Represented By: Gregory M. Sato
Represented By: Chelsea C. Maja
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Represented By: David M. Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Spurling
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Miguel
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavan Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Chang
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?