Nautilus Insurance Company v. RMB Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: RMB Enterprises, Inc. dba Paradise Pacific Homes and RMB Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00496
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 12/18/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/11/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nautilus Insurance Company. RMB Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Gallagher, J.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 EO: In light of Plaintiff's 9/23/19 Response, the Court takes no further action on its Order to Show Cause Why This Action Should Not be Dismissed For Lack of Jurisdiction. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #9 Order to Show Cause,, filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Patrick Gallagher, #2 Exhibit A)(Gallagher, J.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/16/2019. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why the Complaint should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff must respond to this Order to Show Cause by September 23, 2019, identifying both the state of incorporation and the principal place of business for each party. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Plaintiff failed to meet its burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction and will result in dismissal of the action. Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2019. (emt, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nautilus Insurance Company [Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons] Nautilus Insurance Company. (Gallagher, J.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to RMB Enterprises, Inc. dba Paradise Pacific Homes (jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 11/18/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00496 JAO-RT on all further pleadings.(jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nautilus Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Admiral Insurance Company for Nautilus Insurance Company.. (Gallagher, J.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Gallagher, J.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against RMB Enterprises, Inc. dba Paradise Pacific Homes ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2261396.), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gallagher, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. RMB Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMB Enterprises, Inc. dba Paradise Pacific Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMB Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Kamalolookalani K. Koanui-Kong
Represented By: J. Patrick Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?