McCray v. Association of Apartment Owners of Palm Court
Plaintiff: Warren L. McCray and Becky S. McCray
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Palm Court
Case Number: 1:2019cv00499
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/15/2019. No later than April 2, 2020 the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court regarding the status of Malabe v. AOAO of Executive Centre, SCWC-17-0000145 in the Hawaii Supreme Court. (jo)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warren L. McCray, Becky S. McCray. Association of Apartment Owners of Palm Court served through Tiffany Sugai. (Ho, Timothy) Docket Text Modified on 10/15/2019 (jo)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/13/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Palm Court. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00499 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Warren L. McCray Notice of Related Cases Warren L. McCray. (Ho, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Warren L. McCray. (Ho, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Palm Court ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2261550.), filed by Warren L. McCray.(Ho, Timothy) Modified on 9/12/2019 Note: This document bears the electronic signature of Steven K. S. Chung, Esq. , but is e-filed under the CM/ECF filing credentials of Timothy E. Ho, Esq. (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray v. Association of Apartment Owners of Palm Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren L. McCray
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky S. McCray
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Palm Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?