Pullen et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Howard Pullen and Elizabeth Pullen
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00510
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (emt, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00510 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 EO: The Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter will remain as the Magistrate Judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 (CERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-163), Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (Certified order received from the to Northern District of California on 11/4/2019.) (emt, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ENTRY ORDER re ECF No. #8 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-163), MDL NO. 2741. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 11/1/2019. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (emt, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-163), MDL NO. 2741, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7- day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (emt, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Pullen, Elizabeth Pullen. Monsanto Company served on 10/8/2019. (Green, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 10/10/2019 (jo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00510 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial; (Proposed) Summons against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2266958.), filed by Howard Pullen, Elizabeth Pullen.(Green, Michael) Docket text modified on 9/24/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullen et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Pullen
Represented By: Maria F. Penn
Represented By: Denise M. Hevicon
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Pullen
Represented By: Maria F. Penn
Represented By: Denise M. Hevicon
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?