Latu v. Beneficial Life Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Lominga Latu
Defendant: David J. Pearce, Does 1-7, Roe Companies 8-15 and Beneficial Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00515
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 Beneficial Life Insurance Companys ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Beneficial Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eyerly, Tred)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 10/28/2019. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion had.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 10/26/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Kobayashi.An Early Settlement Conference is set for 2/4/20 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Early Settlement Conference Letters are due by 1/28/20.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 10/26/2020 in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/15/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 2/4/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 7/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/27/2020. Discovery due by 8/28/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beneficial Life Insurance Company re Initial Disclosures, dated October 23, 2019 (Eyerly, Tred)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beneficial Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Deseret Management Corporation for Beneficial Life Insurance Company.. (Eyerly, Tred)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 REDACTION to #16 Scheduling Conference Statement, Exhibit "1" by Beneficial Life Insurance Company. (Eyerly, Tred)
October 22, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that Exhibit 1 to docket number #16 Scheduling Conference Statement filed by Beneficial Life Insurance Company, contains personal identifiers. To comply with the policy of the Judicial Conference of the United States and the E-Government Act of 2002, and to promote electronic access to case files while also protecting personal privacy and other legitimate interests, parties shall refrain from including, or shall partially redact when inclusion is necessary. The filing party may refer to the CM/ECF Guide, specifically, 13.0 Privacy and Redactions and 13.1 Responsibility of Counsel. A redacted version of the exhibit, along with a caption cover page, identifying the filing party, case number and document caption may be submitted. For e-filing purposes, select the filing event "Redacted Document" from the "Other Documents" filing category. When prompted, please "link" the redacted exhibit to the Scheduling Conference Statement, ECF No. #16 . (emt, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Beneficial Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (RESTRICTED to Case Participants and the Court) , #2 Certificate of Service)(Eyerly, Tred) Modified on 10/22/2019 to restrict Exhibit 1 to case participants and the Court (emt, ).
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Delivery of Rule 26 Disclosures. (Wilder, Gregory)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 For clerical purposes only, the Clerk's Office has re-entered ECF No. #13 AMENDED DOCUMENT (Second Amended Complaint) using the filing event "amended complaint" : SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Demand included) against Beneficial Life Insurance Company, Does 1-7, Roe Companies 8-15 - filed by Lominga Latu. (emt, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 This document has been re-entered, see ECF No. #14 Second Amended Complaint: AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lominga Latu. Second Amended Complaint. (Wilder, Gregory) Modified on 10/17/2019 (emt, ).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO AMEND COMPLAINT; EXHIBIT "A" - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM A. TRADER on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (emt, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JEFFREY J. HUNT re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM A. TRADER on 10/15/2019. (emt, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SARA M. NIELSON re #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM A. TRADER on 10/15/2019. (emt, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Eyerly, Tred)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey J, Hunt Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2275436.Tred R. Eyerly appearing for Defendants Beneficial Life Insurance Company, David J. Pearce (Eyerly, Tred)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Sara M. Nielson Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2275427.Tred R. Eyerly appearing for Defendants Beneficial Life Insurance Company, David J. Pearce (Eyerly, Tred)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Wilder, Gregory) Docket text modified on 10/10/2019 (emt, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 EO: Gregory Wilder is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/19 @ 9:00 AM. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS From the Circuit Court of The First Circuit; State of Hawai'i CV 18-1-1977-12 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Computerized Index, #2 Civil Information Sheet, #3 Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand) (apg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #5 Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service) (emt, ). Modified on 10/2/2019 to include the "Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service" (emt, ).
September 25, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Notice to Non E-Filer shall be served by First Class Mail to Kayla M. Fajota, Esq. at the address of record on September 26, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 25, 2019 Notice to Non E-Filer - The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert via both paper and electronic service. Beginning with the email service of document numbers 2 Notice of Assignment and #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, the Clerk's Office will only serve Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. (emt, )
September 25, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 2 Notice of Case Assignment and #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference shall be served by First Class Mail to Gregory J. Wilder, II, Esq. and Kayla M. Fajota, Esq. at the addresses of record on September 26, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00515 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Beneficial Life Insurance Company, a Utah corporation,, David J Pearce to Federal Court from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number Civil 18-1-1977-12 JHA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2267953), filed by Beneficial Life Insurance Company, a Utah corporation,, David J Pearce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons, Complaint with Jury Demand, CV 18-1-1977-12 JHA) , #2 Exhibit B (First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CV 18-1-1977) , #3 Notice of Filing, #4 Certificate of Service)(Eyerly, Tred) Docket text modified on 9/25/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latu v. Beneficial Life Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Pearce
Represented By: Kayla M. Fajota
Represented By: Tred R. Eyerly
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Sara Meg Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Companies 8-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kayla M. Fajota
Represented By: Tred R. Eyerly
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Sara Meg Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lominga Latu
Represented By: Gregory J. Wilder, II
Represented By: Gregory John Wilder, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?