Watanabe v. Nordstrom, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hideko Watanabe
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc., John Does 1-20, Mary Roes 1-20 and Doe Corporations and Other Entities 1-20
Case Number: 1:2019cv00525
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SRULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on October 28, 2019. (bbb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 10/26/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 09/15/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 01/15/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 08/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 05/27/2020. Discovery due by 08/28/2020. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:27 - 9:30.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.'s Local Rule 16.2(B) Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Conference Statement)(Chun, Lauren) Modified on 10/22/2019 (emt, ).
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Rule 26(F) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Iwanaga, Michiro) Modified on 10/21/2019 (emt, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Rule 16Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Iwanaga, Michiro) Modified on 10/18/2019 (emt, ).
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Iwanaga, Michiro)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Nordstrom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Lauren)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 18-1-1926-11 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Complaint; Summons, #4 Ex Parte Motion for First Extension of Time to Serve Complaint, Extension to Pretrial Statement; Declaration of Michiro Iwanaga; Declaration of Marilyn Naka; (Proposed) Order, #5 Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for First Extension to Service Complaint and Extension to File Pretrial Statement, #6 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (Nordstrom Inc.), #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
September 27, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the 3 Notice of Case Assignment, #4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Notice to Non E-Filer shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on September 30, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Notice to Non E-Filer - The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Sakai Iwanaga Sutton Law Group via both paper and electronic service. Beginning with the email service of document numbers 3 Notice of Case Assignment and #4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, the Clerk's Office will only serve Sakai Iwanaga Sutton Law Group electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00525 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nordstrom, Inc.. (Saffery, Edmund)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nordstrom, Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number Civil No. 18-1-1926-11 JHA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2269257), filed by Nordstrom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1 (Complaint, CV 18-1-1926-11 JHA) , #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chun, Lauren) Modified on 9/27/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watanabe v. Nordstrom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren K. Chun
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roes 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations and Other Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hideko Watanabe
Represented By: Wayne M. Sakai
Represented By: Michiro Iwanaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?