Lewis v. Lewis Electric LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lee B. Lewis and Lee Lewis
Defendant: Adam Ibarra, Adan Ibarra, CCI, Inc., Lewis Electric LLC, Mary Ibarra and Vince Colarelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv00527
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 EO: Counsel Brett R. Tobin informs the Court that they are still in the process of locating the remaining Defendants in the case and intend to serve by publication if location is unsuccessful. Therefore, to allow Plaintiff sufficient time to locate, serve by publication if needed, and for Defendant's to answer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/02/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 02/13/2020 at 9:30 a.m.before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 02/06/2020. Mr. Tobin to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) Modified on 11/26/2019 (bbb, ).
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 EO: In light of the #19 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants Lewis Electric LLC and CCI, Inc. Plaintiff shall seek default judgment against Defendants Lewis Electric LLC and CCI, Inc. no later than 12/7/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendants Lewis Electric LLC and CCI, Inc., re ECF No. #18 . (emt, ) Modified on 11/8/2019 (emt, ).
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Lewis Electric LLC and CCI, Inc. Brett R. Tobin appearing for Plaintiff Lee B. Lewis (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett R. Tobin, #2 Entry of Default)(Tobin, Brett)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee B. Lewis. Lewis Electric LLC served on 10/15/2019. (Tobin, Brett) Modified on 11/6/2019 (ens).
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee B. Lewis. CCI, Inc. served on 10/15/2019. (Tobin, Brett) Modified on 11/6/2019 (ens).
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Vince Colarelli. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Mary Ibarra. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Adam Ibarra. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to CCI, Inc. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Lewis Electric LLC. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00527 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Tobin, Brett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Tobin, Brett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Tobin, Brett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Tobin, Brett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Tobin, Brett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Lee B. Lewis. (Tobin, Brett)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2272175.), filed by Lee B. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Demand for Jury Trial)(Tobin, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Lewis Electric LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adan Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ibarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Colarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee B. Lewis
Represented By: Brett R. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Lewis
Represented By: Brett R. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?