Kuhlman v. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Plaintiff: Scott Kuhlman Jeffrey, Lisa Mina Memea-Kuhlman and Jeffrey Scott Kuhlman
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00529
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Scott Kuhlman, Lisa Mina Memea-Kuhlman. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon served on 11/18/2019. (Ho, Timothy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon. (emt, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 is CONTINUED to 1/6/2020 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 19-00529 LEK -WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Consent Election Form
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00529 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Scott Kuhlman Jeffrey Notice of Related Cases Scott Kuhlman Jeffrey. (Ho, Timothy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Scott Kuhlman Jeffrey. (Ho, Timothy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2272326.), filed by Scott Kuhlman Jeffrey Jeffrey Scott Kuhlman, Lisa Mina Memea-Kuhlman .(Ho, Timothy) Modified on 10/4/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhlman v. Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kuhlman Jeffrey
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Mina Memea-Kuhlman
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Kuhlman
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Terrazza/Cortebella/Las Brisas/Tiburon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?