U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Southland Contracting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Southland Contracting, Inc., Mole Constructors, Inc., Does 1 - 5 and Southland Mole JV
Case Number: 1:2019cv00530
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT DECREE; ORDER; EXHIBIT A - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/10/2019. (jo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and Defendants Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV, Mole Constructors, Inc. Please continue to reflect case number CV 19-00530 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Consent Election Form. (emt, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Cole on behalf of Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV on behalf of Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV. (Cole, Christopher)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Consent Election Form
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Southland Mole JV. (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Southland Contracting, Inc. (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mole Constructors, Inc. (emt, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (jo) Modified on 10/1/2019 (emt, ). ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed.
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 11/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00530 WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Park, Anna)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 - 5, Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Park, Anna) Modified on 10/1/2019 : Additional Defendants Mole Constructors, Inc. and Southland Mole JV are not identified in the party caption of the Complaint (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Southland Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Eric Yau
Represented By: Anna Y. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mole Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland Mole JV
Represented By: Christopher J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?