United States of America v. Albert C. Kobayashi, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Palehua Apartments LP, Wailea Fairway Villas, Kahului Town Terrace L.P., Design Partners, Inc., Napili Villas HOA, Inc., Michael N Goshi, Albert C. Kobayashi, Inc., Fritz Johnson, Inc., Mr Martin V Cooper, Napilihau Villages Association of Apartment Owners, Frederick M Johnson, Michael N. Goshi, Martin V. Cooper, Kahului Town Terrace LP and Frederick M. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00531
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY . Please be advised that the Notices of Appearance, ECF Nos. #19 filed by Napili Villas HOA, Inc., Wailea Fairway Villas, Napilihau Villages Association of Apartment Owners and #23 filed by Kahului Town Terrace LP reflect the appearance of multiple attorneys. To ensure that each attorney is property associated to the case, it is recommended that individual Notices of Appearance be filed by each attorney using their own CM/ECF login credentials. (emt, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig K. Shikuma (Craig K. Shikuma and Jonathan A. Kobayashi) on behalf of Kahului Town Terrace LP on behalf of Kahului Town Terrace LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shikuma, Craig) Modified on 11/26/2019 (emt, ).
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Leroy E. Colombe on behalf of Fritz Johnson, Inc. and Frederick M. Johnson on behalf of Fritz Johnson, Inc.. (Colombe, Leroy) Modified on 11/21/2019 (emt, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 EO: On 11/6/19, Bays Lung Rose & Holma filed a notice of appearance of counsel (ECF No. 17) for Defendant Association of Apartment Owners of Wailea Fairway Villas ("Defendant"). On 11/12/19, attorneys of record for Defendant, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC ("Counsel"), filed a Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (ECF No. 20). The Court finds that good cause exists and approves the withdrawal of counsel pursuant to LR83.5 (ECF No. 20). re #20 Notice (Other), #17 Notice of Appearance. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
November 13, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. 12.16 Submission of Proposed Orders: Please be advised that docket number #20 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Wailea Fairway Villas requires court approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader at trader_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for further guidance. The Guide is available on the Court's website at www.hid.uscourts.gov. (emt, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Wailea Fairway Villas Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wailea Fairway Villas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Bruce)
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory K. Markham (Gregory K. Markham and Keith K. Kato) on behalf of Napili Villas HOA, Inc., Napilihau Villages Association of Apartment Owners, Wailea Fairway Villas on behalf of Napili Villas HOA, Inc., Napilihau Villages Association of Apartment Owners, Wailea Fairway Villas. (Markham, Gregory) Modified on 11/26/2019 (emt, ).
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' request, and by agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 2/3/2020 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/27/20. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Paris on behalf of Wailea Fairway Villas on behalf of Wailea Fairway Villas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Paris, Sharon)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Napili Villas HOA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Wailea Fairway Villas waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Michael N. Goshi waiver sent on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Design Partners, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Napilihau Villages Association of Apartment Owners waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Frederick M. Johnson waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Fritz Johnson, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Kahului Town Terrace LP waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Palehua Apartments LP waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Albert C. Kobayashi, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Garcia, Michelle)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Martin V. Cooper. (emt, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Garcia, Michelle)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00531 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Albert C. Kobayashi, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palehua Apartments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wailea Fairway Villas
Represented By: Gregory K. Markham
Represented By: Sharon Paris
Represented By: David R. Major
Represented By: Bruce Byron Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kahului Town Terrace L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Design Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napili Villas HOA, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory K. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N Goshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert C. Kobayashi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fritz Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Leroy E. Colombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Martin V Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napilihau Villages Association of Apartment Owners
Represented By: Gregory K. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N. Goshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin V. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kahului Town Terrace LP
Represented By: Craig K. Shikuma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick M. Johnson
Represented By: Leroy E. Colombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sydney Spector
Represented By: Michelle Teresa Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?