Villella v. Lam
Plaintiff: Gino Victor Villella
Defendant: John Doe Partnerships 1-5, Roe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Roe Non-Profit Corporations 1-5, Xiao Mei Lam, John Does 1-5, John Doe Corporations 1-5 and Airbnb, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00539
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entry #12 Stipulation filed by Airbnb, Inc. requires the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers email address. (jo)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order Re: Insurance Policy by Airbnb, Inc.. (Miyagi, Melvyn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 EO: James Krueger is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/19 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gino Victor Villella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Krueger, James) Docket Text Modified on 10/7/2019 (jo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 EO: In response to the court's October 3, 2019, Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff has sought leave to file an amended complaint. See ECF No. #8 . Although it appears under Rule 15(a)(1) that permission to amend is not required in this instance, the court GRANTS the request. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 21 days of service of the original complaint. The court DISSOLVES the October 3, 2019 Order to Show Cause. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gino Victor Villella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Krueger, James)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/3/2019. "Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to SHOW CAUSE why the action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. In showing cause, Plaintiff shall properly identify the citizenship of Plaintiff and all Defendants (i.e., including that of Defendant Airbnb, Inc.). If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order to Show Cause by October 17, 2019, the court will find that Plaintiff has not carried their burden of establishing this court's jurisdiction and will dismiss the action without prejudice." (jo)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Airbnb, Inc. (emt, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Xiao Mei Lam. (emt, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00539 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xiao Mei Lam, Airbnb, Inc. against by Gino Victor Villella ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2271312.), filed by Gino Victor Villella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Main Document (Proposed) Lam Summons, #5 Main Document (Proposed) Airbnb Summons)(Krueger, James) Modified on 10/2/2019 (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villella v. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Non-Profit Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiao Mei Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gino Victor Villella
Represented By: James Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?