Bohm v. City and County of Honolulu
Plaintiff: Jianna Bohm
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu, P M Autoworks Inc., Jane/John Does 1-29, Imanueli V. K. Kotobalavu, Ace Towing Service, Inc. and All Island Automotive Towing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00541
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Jianna Bohm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Summons)(Gronna, Richard) Docket Text Modified on 11/27/2019 (jo)
November 22, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entry #9 Amended Complaint filed by Jianna Bohm was not filed in its entirety. The filing party shall resubmit a corrected filing. (jo)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 **Refiled at ECF #10 ** First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jianna Bohm. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons)(Gronna, Richard) Docket Text Modified on 11/22/2019 (jo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Counsel for Defendant City and County of Honolulu Mitsuko Takahashi, whom has not formally filed an appearance in the case, informs the Court that the parties have agreed on extending the Defendant's answer and that the Plaintiff will be file an Amended Complaint no later than November 22, 2019 to avoid unnecessary motions being filed. Therefore, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/19/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 12/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference will be due by 12/13/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 EO: Pursuant to Defendant Ace Towing Service, Inc.'s request, and by agreement from Plaintiff, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/02/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 12/19/2019, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 12/12/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield2)
October 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianna Bohm. Ace Towing Service, Inc. served on 10/24/2019. (jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00541 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against City and County of Honolulu, Imanueli V. K. Kotobalavu, Ace Towing Service, Inc., P M Autoworks, Inc., Island Automotive Towing ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2272923.), filed by Jianna Bohm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Summons in a Civil Action)(Gronna, Richard) Docket text modified on 10/7/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohm v. City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P M Autoworks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-29
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imanueli V. K. Kotobalavu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Towing Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Island Automotive Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianna Bohm
Represented By: Richard D. Gronna
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?