Narvaes v. Crane Company et al
Plaintiff: Stanley J. Narvaes
Defendant: Does 1-25, Crane Company and Ingersoll Rand Co.
Not Yet Classified: Keith Hunter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00548
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 EO: Court sets a Status Conference with other related cases for the same date and time of 03/25/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 15, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #19 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR has been served by First Class Mail to Keith Hunter at Dispute Prevention & Resolution, Inc., 1003 Bishop Street, Pauahi Tower Suite 1155, Honolulu, HI 96813 on November 18, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/15/2019. Keith Hunter added as Mediator. (emt, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 EO: The Court VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/18/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND CO.S RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crane Company Certificate of Service Re: Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Harstad, William)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeRobertis, L.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (DeRobertis, L.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed September 12, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM Against All Other Defendants against Does 1-25, Ingersoll Rand Co. by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Goodwin, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Co. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Co... (Goodwin, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Ingersoll-Rand's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Company, Does 1-25 by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claim Asserted by All Other Defendants Against Ingersoll-Rand Co., #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; Civil No. 19-1-1461-09 (JHA) (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: HAJIS, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 Plaintiff's Request to be Exempt from CAAP, #6 CAAP's Decision Granting Request to be Exempt, #7 Declaration of Service, #8 Defendant Crane Co's Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal; Exhibit A - #1 ) (jo)
October 9, 2019 PAYMENT of Fees - Payment for Complaint re #3 Supplement, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Supplement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0975-2275126.. (Harstad, William)
October 9, 2019 PAYMENT of Fees re #3 Supplement, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Supplement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet. (Harstad, William)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 11/18/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00548 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Crane Company. (Harstad, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company, #2 Supplement, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit, Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #2 Exhibit 4b - Forman,Samuel.Affidavit. Ex. A-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #3 Exhibit 5 - Crane Co.'s Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal [ECF 1]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3b - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. G, H, J, L, #2 Exhibit 3c - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. N, O, P, #3 Exhibit 3d - Sargent,David.Affidavit. Ex. R, T, U)(Harstad, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.Sections 1442 & 1446 from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-1461-09 (JHA). ( Filing fee $ 400), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D, #4 Exhibit 3a - Sargent,David.Affidavit, Ex. A, A-1, B, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narvaes v. Crane Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.
Represented By: Robert S. Alcorn
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley J. Narvaes
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?