Yamada v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jon K. Yamada
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5, United Airlines, Inc., Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5 and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2019cv00551
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/21/2019. (emt, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 10/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 09/01/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 07/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 05/13/2020. Discovery due by 08/14/2020. If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298 at anytime.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:30 - 9:36.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Healy, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Zorc, Eileen)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Planning Meeting JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING. (Zorc, Eileen)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Brower, Charles)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc. (RE: DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF JON K. YAMADA) (Zorc, Eileen)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc. (RE: DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JON K. YAMADA) (Zorc, Eileen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; CV 19-1-0411-03 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (Re: United Airlines), #6 Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Certificate of Service, #7 Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit "1"; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc... (Zorc, Eileen)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/18/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00551 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by United Airlines, Inc.. (Zorc, Eileen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Airlines, Inc. DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-0411-03. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2276174), filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dorota Karpierz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Eileen C. Zorc, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service)(Zorc, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yamada v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen C. Zorc
Represented By: Ronald Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon K. Yamada
Represented By: Charles H. Brower
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?