PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund v. Akua Air Conditioning LLC
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund and PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund
Defendant: Akua Air Conditioning LLC, Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00553
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion had re: status of the case.Ms. Kawada informed the Court that she will be filing a motion for default judgment as soon as possible.A Telephone Status Conference is set for 1/29/20 @ 9:00 a.m. Telephone Conference is set for 1/29/2020 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf )
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Statement . (Kawada, Christin) Modified on 12/9/2019 (emt, ).
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Akua Air Conditioning LLC, re ECF No. #7 REQUEST for Entry of Default Against Defendant Akua Air Conditioning LLC. (emt, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION REQUEST for Entry of Default Against Defendant Akua Air Conditioning LLC Christin D. W. Kawada appearing for Plaintiffs PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christin D. W. Kawada, #2 Entry of Default Against Defendant Akua Air Conditioning LLC)(Kawada, Christin) Modified on 12/6/2019 (emt, ).
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund, PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund. Akua Air Conditioning LLC. (Kawada, Christin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Akua Air Conditioning LLC. (emt, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00553 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Summons against Akua Air Conditioning LLC, a Hawaii limited liability company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2276255.), filed by PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawada, Christin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund v. Akua Air Conditioning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akua Air Conditioning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Training Fund
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Cooperation Fund
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?