Masalta v. Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf
Plaintiff: Marjorie Masalta
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf, Ann Shipman, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Makena Surf Association of Apartment Owners and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00557
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 EP: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held.The Court met with the parties. Settlement discussions held.No settlement reached at this time.Parties may contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298, if they so wish further assistance in settlement with the Court.(KJM Chambers 9:30 - 10:30.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/16/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 01/10/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff Marjorie Masalta's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Woo, Jason) Modified on 12/10/2019 (emt, ).
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mullin, Brian) Modified on 12/10/2019 (emt, ).
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 EO: By joint request, an Early Settlement Conference is set for 12/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference Statements due by 12/05/2019. Counsel Brian M. Mullin to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marjorie Masalta. Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; Ann Shipman waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Woo, Jason)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Major on behalf of Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf, Ann Shipman on behalf of Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf, Ann Shipman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Re Notice of Appearance of Counsel (David R. Major))(Major, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Mullin on behalf of Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf, Ann Shipman on behalf of Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf, Ann Shipman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Re Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Brian M. Mullin))(Mullin, Brian)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/16/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/15/2019 to correct time on file stamp, NEF regenerated ) (emt, ). Modified on 10/15/2019 (emt, ).
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00557 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2277039.), filed by Marjorie Masalta. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woo, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masalta v. Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Makena Surf
Represented By: Brian M Mullin
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Shipman
Represented By: Brian M Mullin
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makena Surf Association of Apartment Owners
Represented By: Brian M Mullin
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Masalta
Represented By: Jason S. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?