Grandinetti v. Agaran et al
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti
Defendant: Wes Mun, Nolan P. Espinda, Jodie F. Maesaka-Hirata, Renee R. Sonobe Hong, Dr. Michael Hegmann, Dr. Caroline Mee, Deborah Stampfle, Tina Agaran, Carole Payne and Maria C. Cook
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00568
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of USCA as to #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Francis Grandinetti, USCA NO. 19-17406: Appeal No. 19-17406 is dismissed. This order, served on the district court for the District of Hawaii, shall constitute the mandate of this court. DISMISSED. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Anthony Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 18, 2019.
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 USCA Case Number 19-17406 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Francis Grandinetti: This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 06-80108. The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be permitted to proceed. Do not file a brief until/unless directed by the Court to do so. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order only if the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed. (emt, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 11/26/2019 pursuant to ECF No. #2 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 26, 2019.
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 - by Francis Grandinetti. (Appeal Fee: DUE) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ) Modified on 12/2/2019 USCA NO. 19-17406 (emt, ).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISMISSAL ORDER signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/31/2019. The Complaint and this action are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and (g). The Clerk SHALL TERMINATE this case. Any pending motions are DENIED. The Court will take no further action in this case beyond processing a notice of appeal. (apg, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for F.D.P. and S.D. P. Torts, Ongoing against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandinetti v. Agaran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Mun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan P. Espinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodie F. Maesaka-Hirata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee R. Sonobe Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael Hegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Caroline Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Stampfle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Agaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?