Field v. PNC Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Dane S. Field
Defendant: Michael Alden Smith, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and PNC Bank, N.A.
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Case Number: 1:2019cv00573
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dane S. Field (Re: 1) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019, 2) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Admissions to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019, and 3) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019} (Bickerton, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse W. Schiel on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schiel, Jesse)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse W. Schiel on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schiel, Jesse)
November 22, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the Notices of Appearance, ECF Nos. #18 and #19 , filed by PNC Bank, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, reflect the appearance of multiple attorneys. To ensure that each attorney is properly associated to the case, it is recommended that individual Notices of Appearance be filed by each attorney using their own CM/ECF login credentials. (emt, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Monlux (David M. Louie, Jesse W. Schiel, Nicholas R. Monlux) on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas) Modified on 11/22/2019 (emt, ).
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Co-Counsel by Nicholas R. Monlux (David M. Louie, Jesse W. Schiel and Nicholas R. Monlux) on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Monlux, Nicholas) Modified on 11/22/2019 (emt, ).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/21/2019. (emt, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Bird on behalf of Michael Alden Smith on behalf of Michael Alden Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bird, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 EP: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Counsel Zachary Kondo specially appearing on behalf of Defendant Federal Home Loans Mortgage Corporation. Counsel David Louie appearing on behalf of Defendants PNC Bank and Federal Home Loans Mortgage Corporation. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 11/16/2020 in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/6/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 8/12/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions Deadline N/A. Discovery Deadline N/A.Court to issue a Scheduling Order.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:45 - 9:49.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Alden Smith Re: JOINDER in (1) PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff dated November 1, 2019, (2) PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff dated November 1, 2019, and (3) PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatoires to Plaintiff dated November 1, 2019 (Kaiawe, Summer)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION TO DISTRICT COURT TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE IN ORDER TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT JURY TRIAL re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/8/2019. ( Scheduling Conference is set for 11/14/2019 09:45 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.) (emt, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO Attorney Richard E. Gottlieb for PNC Bank, N.A. added, Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/06/2019. (apg, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Brett J. Natarelli appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A., signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD, ON 11/06/2019. (apg, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Arthur F. Radke appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A, signed by JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (apg, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Arthur F. Radke Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286497.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Richard E. Gottlieb Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286492.Lauren K. Chun appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Chun, Lauren)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice For Brett J. Natarelli, ESQ. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286488.Lauren K. Chun appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Chun, Lauren) Modified on 11/6/2019 (apg, ).
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund K. Saffery on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service re: Notice of Appearance of Counsel)(Saffery, Edmund)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00573 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Transmittal to District Court from U.S. Bankruptcy Court Re: Bankruptcy Judge's Recommendation to Withdraw Reference (Schedule Jury Trial), Case No. 17-00585, A.P. No. 19-90024. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, Adversary Proceeding # 19-90024, #2 Recommendation to District Court to Withdraw Reference to Schedule Jury Trial) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. PNC Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Alden Smith
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Represented By: Thomas H.Y.P. Yee
Represented By: Michael C. Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Jesse W. Schiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lauren K. Chun
Represented By: Brett J. Natarelli
Represented By: Richard E. Gottlieb
Represented By: Arthur F. Radke
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Jesse W. Schiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane S. Field
Represented By: Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton
Represented By: John F. Perkin
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?