Kane et al v. PaCap Aviation Finance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Kane, Air Line Pilots Association, International and Hawaii Teamsters and Allied Workers, Local 996
Defendant: Catherine Yannone, Malama Investments, LLC, Ohana Airline Holdings, LLC, PaCap Aviation Finance, LLC, Kitty Lagareta, PaCap Management Solutions, LLC, Carbonview Limited, LLC, Jack Tsui, Paul Marinelli, Lawrence J. Ellison, Christopher Gossert, Jeffrey Au, Snowbiz Ventures, LLC, PacificCap Investment Management, LLC, Lawrence J. Ellison Revocable Trust, Lawrence Investments, LLC, Jack Chuck She Tsui Trust and PaCap Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00574
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/21/2019. (emt, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Trial Dates and Deadlines given: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/9/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 4/19/2021 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EO: In light of the #6 Order Adopting Recommendation to District Court to Withdraw Reference to Schedule Trial, the pending #3 , #4 motions to dismiss are hereby terminated. Judge Faris will address these motions to dismiss. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION TO DISTRICT COURT TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE TO SCHEDULE JURY TRIAL re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 11/20/2019. Magistrate Judge Trader shall issue a scheduling order setting an April 2021 trial date and related trial deadlines. This matter will remain with Judge Faris for all other purposes until ninety days before trial. (emt, )
October 30, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY - No Original Signature - Please be advised that the declarations in documents #3 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim filed by Christopher Gossert and #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim filed by Catherine Yannone do not contain scanned images of the signatures. The filing party may refer to Section 7.2 - Third Party Signatures, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide which states "An electronically filed document requiring the original, wet signature of an individual other than the CM/ECF user, such as an affidavit or declaration, must contain the original or a scanned image of that individual's signature." To resubmit, select the filing event "Original Signature" from the "Other Documents" filing category. When prompted by the filing system, "link" the declarations to the related document. (ens)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 EO: On October 23, 2019, the bankruptcy judge transmitted a Recommendation to District Court to Withdraw Reference to Schedule Jury Trial. The Court DIRECTS the parties to file any objections to the Recommendation by November 8, 2019. The Court will issue a ruling thereafter. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim David C. Farmer appearing for Defendant Catherine Yannone (Attachments: #1 Defendant Catherine Yannone's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Declaration of Catherine Yannone, #3 Certificate of Service)(Farmer, David) Modified attachment description on 10/29/2019 (ens).
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim David C. Farmer appearing for Defendant Christopher Gossert (Attachments: #1 Defendant Christopher Gossert's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Declaration of Christopher Gossert)(Farmer, David) Modified attachment description on 10/29/2019 (ens).
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00574 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Catherine Yannone served by First Class Mail to the address of record on October 24, 2019. Thomas N. Ciantra, Esq., Peter W. Ito, Esq., Rahman Connelly, Esq., Lorenzo Marinuzzi, Esq. and Darryl P. Rains, Esq., served by First Class Mail to the addresses reflected on the Bankruptcy Court's docket, A.P. # 19-90027 on October 24, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Transmittal to District Court from U.S. Bankruptcy Court Re: Bankruptcy Judge's Recommendation to Withdraw Reference (Schedule Jury Trial), Case No. 17-01078, A.P. No. 19-90027. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, Adversary Proceeding # 19-90027, #2 Recommendation to District Court to Withdraw Reference to Schedule Jury Trial) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kane et al v. PaCap Aviation Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Yannone
Represented By: David C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malama Investments, LLC
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohana Airline Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Represented By: Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PaCap Aviation Finance, LLC
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitty Lagareta
Represented By: David C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PaCap Management Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbonview Limited, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Represented By: Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Tsui
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Marinelli
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Represented By: Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Ellison
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Gossert
Represented By: David C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Au
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snowbiz Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacificCap Investment Management, LLC
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Ellison Revocable Trust
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Represented By: Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Investments, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Rahman Connelly
Represented By: Darryl P. Rains
Represented By: Lorenzo Marinuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Chuck She Tsui Trust
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PaCap Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Kane
Represented By: Wendy F. Hanakahi
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nickolas A. Kacprowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Line Pilots Association, International
Represented By: Wendy F. Hanakahi
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nickolas A. Kacprowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Teamsters and Allied Workers, Local 996
Represented By: Wendy F. Hanakahi
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nickolas A. Kacprowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?