Yukutake et al v. Connors et al
Plaintiff: Todd Yukutake and David Kikukawa
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu and Clare E. Connors
Case Number: 1:2019cv00578
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Clare E. Connors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moser, Kendall)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Clare E. Connors, in her official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of Hawaii's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moser, Kendall)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Kikukawa, Todd Yukutake Discovery Propounded to All Defendants (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EO: Stephen D. Stamboulieh and Alan Beck are allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/20 @ 9:00 AM. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Honolulu re City's Initial Disclosures (Winter, Nicolette)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Scheduling Conference Statement Certificate of Service. (Winter, Nicolette)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Winter, Nicolette)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Kikukawa, Todd Yukutake Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Certificate of Service by City and County of Honolulu.(Winter, Nicolette)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entry #14 Answer to Complaint, filed by Clare E. Connors is not signed. The filing party may refer to the CM/ECF Guide, see Page 7, Signatures, which states "The electronic filing of any document by a Registered Participant shall constitute the signature of that person for all purposes provided in the Federal Rules. Pleadings should indicate the signature of a party by inserting a "/s/" followed by the attorney's name and place it in the document where the original signature would be utilized in a conventional document. The format should look like: /s/ John/Jane Attorney." No further action required. (jo)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant Clare E. Connors, In Her Official Capacity as the Attorney General of the State of Hawaii's Answer to Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by Clare E. Connors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moser, Kendall)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Yukutake. Clare E. Connors served on 10/28/2019. (Beck, Alan) Modified on 11/6/2019 (ens).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Yukutake. City and County of Honolulu served on 10/28/2019. (Beck, Alan) Modified on 11/6/2019 (ens).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/01/2019. Attorney Stephen D. Stamboulieh added. (apg, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen D. Stamboulieh Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2284538. Alan A. Beck appearing for Plaintiff Todd Yukutake (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beck, Alan) Modified on 11/6/2019 (ens).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/23/19 @ 9:00 AM to 1/7/2020 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 12/31/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Clare E. Connors (jo)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu (jo)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 12/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00578 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Beck, Alan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Beck, Alan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2281813.), filed by Todd Yukutake and David Kikukawa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beck, Alan) Docket Text Modified on 10/24/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yukutake et al v. Connors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Yukutake
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kikukawa
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Robert M. Kohn
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare E. Connors
Represented By: Kendall J. Moser
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?