Lauro v. State of Hawaii Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Lauro
Defendant: Dr. Steven DeWitt, Halawa Correctional Facility, Dr Gary Saldana, Waiawa Correctional Facility, State of Hawaii Department of Public Safety and Dr. Sisar Paderes
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2019cv00585
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Until Plaintiff has responded and shown cause by 12/20/19 to the 11/20/2019 Order to Show Cause Why this Action Should not be Dismissed as Barred by the Doctrine of Res Judicata [ECF 8], the Court will take no action at this time on Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel [ECF 9], Amended Motion for Supplemental Jurisdiction to Order Defendants to Remove Plaintiff from Imminent Danger of Serious Physical Injury or Death [ECF 10], and Amended Motion for Transcripts and Documents [ECF 11]. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to Clerk from Thomas Lauro, Re: ECF Nos. #10 , #11 , dated November 17, 2019. (emt, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Amended Plaintiff's MOTION for Transcripts and Documents - by Plaintiff Thomas Lauro. (emt, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Supplemental Jurisdiction to Order Defendants to Remove Plaintiff from Immenent Danger of Serious Physical Injury or Death - by Plaintiff Thomas Lauro. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Councel, Exhibit # 1, Motion for Relief from Judgmeont or Order, Rule 60, Fraud on the Court (filed), Exhibit # 2 Case No. 12-CV-00637 DKW-RT (filed) - by Plaintiff Thomas Lauro. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS BARRED BY THE DOCTRINE OF RES JUDICATA - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/20/2019. Show Cause Response due by 12/20/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Thomas Lauro shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 20, 2019.
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING AS-CONSTRUED MOTION FOR RECUSAL re #6 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/20/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Thomas Lauro shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 20, 2019.
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Letter addressed to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Thomas Lauro, dated November 4, 2019, Re: Request to reassign CV 19-00585 DKW-KJM. Note: The letter has been entered in CV 19-00585 DKW-KJM, only. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application filed in CV 12-00637 DKW-RT, #2 Motion for Relief from Judgment, SPP No. 19-1-0023, #3 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
November 8, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #5 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION shall be served by First Class Mail to Thomas Lauro at the address of record on November 8, 2019. A copy of the order shall be served by First Class Mail to the Warden at Halawa Correctional Facility, at Halawa Correctional Facility, 99-902 Moanalua Rd., Aiea, HI 96701. DPS Litigation Coordinators Shelley Nobriga Harrington, Esq. and Laurie Nadamoto, Esq. and Financial Department for the District of Hawaii were served electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/7/2019. (emt, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven DeWitt, Halawa Correctional Facility, Sisar Paderes, Gary Saldana, State of Hawaii Department of Public Safety, Waiawa Correctional Facility, filed by Thomas Lauro.(apg, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisonerby Plaintiff Thomas Lauro. (apg, )
October 27, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 Order,, #1 Complaint, and a blank IFP form has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record for Thomas Lauro Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (apg, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER- Plaintiff is GRANTED twenty eight days to either pay t he$400.00 filing fee or submit a completed and executed applicationto proceed in forma pauperis on the forms provided by the courtwith this Order, signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/25/2019. (apg, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint against Steven DeWitt, Halawa Correctional Facility, Sisar Paderes, Gary Saldana, State of Hawaii Department of Public Safety, Waiawa Correctional Facility, filed by Thomas Lauro. Jury Trial Demanded. (apg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2019: #1 Supplement Mailing Envelope) (apg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauro v. State of Hawaii Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Steven DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halawa Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Gary Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waiawa Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sisar Paderes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?