Steven A. Hyer, et al. v. City and County of Honolulu, et al.
Plaintiff: Steven A. Hyer, James Fujimoto, Jr., Thomas Fujimoto, Theresa L. Chang and Cassi H. Hyer
Defendant: Susan Ballard, Honolulu Police Department, John Doe 2, Wayne Silva, City and County of Honolulu, John Doe 1, John Does 4-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Unincorporated Organizations 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00586
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 EO: Pursuant to the request of Plaintiff's Counsel, Mr. Peter C. Hsieh, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 09:00 a.m. on 1/09/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER is continued to 2/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 2/07/2020. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00 a.m. on 2/14/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Court reschedules the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/23/19 @ 9:00 AM to 1/9/2020 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/2/20. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven A. Hyer. Wayne Silva served on 11/4/2019. (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 11/8/2019 (ens).
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven A. Hyer. City and County of Honolulu served on 10/28/2019. (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 11/1/2019 (ens).
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven A. Hyer. Honolulu Police Department served on 10/28/2019. (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 11/1/2019 (ens).
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven A. Hyer. Susan Ballard served on 10/28/2019. (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 11/1/2019 (ens).
October 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 12/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00586 HG-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, and Summons against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2282620.), filed by Steven A. Hyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsieh, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven A. Hyer, et al. v. City and County of Honolulu, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 4-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Unincorporated Organizations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Hyer
Represented By: Peter C. Hsieh
Represented By: George A. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fujimoto, Jr.
Represented By: Myles S. Breiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fujimoto
Represented By: Myles S. Breiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa L. Chang
Represented By: Myles S. Breiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassi H. Hyer
Represented By: Peter C. Hsieh
Represented By: George A. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?