Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: David Bernhardt and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00588
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 EO: In light of the #15 Order allowing Defendants to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by February 3, 2020, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/23/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 02/11/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 02/04/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/16/2019. Pursuant to the Parties "Joint Stipulation to Waive the Requirements of Local Rule 16.2," ECF No. #13 , and for good cause shown, the request is APPROVED AND SO ORDERED. (jo)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' FIRST APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER re: #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/16/2019.Defendants shall have until February 3, 2020 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (jo)
December 11, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised that document #13 Stipulation filed by David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service contains a Proposed Order for the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of Judge's email addresses. (jo)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 Application to Extend Time to File Answer. (Sheffield, Sarah) Event Modified on 12/11/2019 (jo)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Waive the Requirements of Local Rule 16.2 by David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Sheffield, Sarah)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. P. Sheffield on behalf of David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service on behalf of David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Sheffield, Sarah)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for ECF 1 Complaint ECF 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement 2 ECF 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ECF 6-1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements ECF 6-2 Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, Waiver of Service of Summons ECF 7-8 Issued Summons ECF 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice served on David Bernhardt, Secretary of the Interior U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Kenji M. Price, U.S. Attorney, and William Barr, U.S. Attorney General U.S. Department of JusticeDavid Bernhardt, Secretary of the Interior U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Kenji M. Price, U.S. Attorney, and William Barr, U.S. Attorney General U.S. Department of Justice on November 6, 2019 and November 7, 2019, filed by Center for Biological Diversity., REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to David Bernhardt, Secretary of the Interior U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Kenji M. Price, U.S. Attorney, and William Barr, U.S. Attorney General U.S. Department of JusticeDavid Bernhardt, Secretary of the Interior U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Kenji M. Price, U.S. Attorney, and William Barr, U.S. Attorney General U.S. Department of Justice on October 31, 2019 by Center for Biological Diversity.( Waiver of Service due by 1/3/2020.) (Phillips, Maxx)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO RYAN ADAIR SHANNON - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/01/2019. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Ryan Adair Shannon Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2283132.Maxx Elizabeth Phillips appearing for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity (Phillips, Maxx)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice to Parties Re: Waiver of Service of Summons) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00588HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (apg, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Phillips, Maxx)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 14 Hawaiian Species CH against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2282977.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Maxx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Sarah J. P. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Sarah J. P. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Maxx Elizabeth Phillips
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?