Aupuni O Hawaii et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Aupuni O Hawaii and Samson, Sr. Lehualani Brown
Defendant: Department of the Interior, President, USA Donald J. Trump, David Y. Ige, Republic of Hawaii, Clare E. Connors, Department of Justice, The, Legislature and Harry Kim
Case Number: 1:2019cv00597
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #5 , 9 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/7/2019. Department of Justice, The answer due 12/16/2019; Department of the Interior answer due 12/16/2019; Donald J. Trump answer due 12/16/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Samson, Sr. Lehualani Brown and Aupuni O Hawaii shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 7, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the order electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 EO: The Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/19 @ 9:00 AM to 1/13/2020 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 1/6/20. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 EO: On 11/4/19, Defendants filed Federal Defendants' Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 5) ("Ex Parte Motion"). The Court notes that the Ex Parte Motion is unopposed. Defendants' attorney, Ms. Sydney Spector, submitted a declaration attached to the Motion (ECF No. 5-2) confirming that Plaintiff does not oppose the Ex Parte Motion and representing that she will provide a copy of the Ex Parte Motion to Plaintiff by U.S. mail. The Court, for good cause, GRANTS the Ex Parte Motion. The Federal Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended from November 8, 2019 to and including December 16, 2019 (60 days from October 16, 2019, the date the U.S. Attorney's Office received a copy of Plaintiff's complaint). granting #5 Ex Parte Motion. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 WRIT OF CERTIORARI TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE THIRD CIRCUIT, HILO DIVISION, STATE OF HAWAII, issued by the Clerk of Court. (apg, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF CERTIORARI, signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/05/2019. (apg, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Writ of Certiorari Ordering the Circuit Court Records from the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit Hilo Division, State of Hawaii by Department of Justice, The, Department of the Interior, Donald J. Trump. (Spector, Sydney)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; COS Sydney Spector appearing for Defendants Department of Justice, The, Department of the Interior, Donald J. Trump (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Sydney Spector)(Spector, Sydney)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Department of Justice, The, Department of the Interior, Donald J. Trump Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action; COS Department of Justice, The, Department of the Interior, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Spector, Sydney) Modified on 11/7/2019 (ens).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/2/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (apg, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00597LEK-RT on all further pleadings (apg, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Department of Justice, The, Donald J. Trump, Department of the Interior ; COS from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, Hilo Division, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-02721., filed by Department of Justice, The, Donald J. Trump, Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spector, Sydney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aupuni O Hawaii et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Sydney Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President, USA Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Sydney Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Y. Ige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare E. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice, The
Represented By: Sydney Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legislature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aupuni O Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samson, Sr. Lehualani Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?